Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01554
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Oct 07, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Pronk Technologies Inc.
8933 Lankershim Boulevard
Sun Valley, CA 91352
Represented By
Pronk Technologies Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Seton Medical Center
1900 Sullivan Avenue
Daly City, CA 94015
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, October 07, 2020
6 6 court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/07 7:33 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1554 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center
5 5 notice Notice Wed 10/07 12:09 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiffs Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Mon 10/05 9:33 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 4/25/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 10:22 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 9:04 PM
Summons Issued on Pronk Technologies Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/26/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center
Saturday, August 29, 2020
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 08/29 3:16 AM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01554-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51650428. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 11:49 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01554. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center, Seton Medical Center against Pronk Technologies Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet