Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01556
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Nov 22, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Rehab Alliance
22995 Mill Creek Drive Suite A
Laguna Hills, CA 92653
Represented By
Rehab Alliance
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, November 22, 2021
13 13 court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/22 2:53 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1556 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Friday, October 29, 2021
12 12 notice Notice Fri 10/29 1:14 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 U.S.C. § 727 Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 16, 2021
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 05/16 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/16/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, May 14, 2021
10 10 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 05/14 10:45 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From May 18, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To November 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/14/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
9 9 misc Status report Tue 05/04 10:54 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, February 18, 2021
8 8 misc Proof of service Thu 02/18 12:28 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiffs St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 01/22 9:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/22/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 01/20 1:58 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From January 26, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To May 18, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/20/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Friday, January 08, 2021
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Fri 01/08 6:39 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 4/25/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
4 4 misc Status report Fri 01/08 10:05 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiffs St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 10:25 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 09/01 3:33 PM
Summons Issued on Rehab Alliance Date Issued 9/1/2020, Answer Due 10/1/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/26/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Saturday, August 29, 2020
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 08/29 3:16 AM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01556-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51650428. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 11:56 AM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01556. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center against Rehab Alliance. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet