Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01561
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Mar 14, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Smith & Nephew, Inc.
150 Minuteman Road
Andover, MA 01810
Represented By
Smith & Nephew, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, March 14, 2022
24 24 court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/14 10:52 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1561 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Monday, February 28, 2022
23 23 notice Notice Mon 02/28 12:50 PM
Notice of Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 02/09 9:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 02/09/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, February 07, 2022
21 21 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 02/07 10:30 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From February 8, 2022 At 10:00 A.M. To April 12, 2022 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/7/2022 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
20 20 misc Status report Tue 01/25 8:59 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 11/17 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/17/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, November 12, 2021
18 18 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 11/12 9:08 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From November 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To February 8, 2022 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/12/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
17 17 misc Status report Tue 11/02 9:02 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Sunday, May 16, 2021
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 05/16 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/16/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, May 14, 2021
15 15 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 05/14 12:47 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From May 18, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To November 16, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/14/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
14 14 misc Status report Tue 05/04 9:50 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, February 18, 2021
13 13 misc Proof of service Thu 02/18 12:31 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiffs St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 23, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 01/23 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/23/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, January 21, 2021
11 11 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 01/21 10:36 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From January 26, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To May 18, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/21/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
10 10 misc Status report Tue 01/12 8:51 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiffs St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Sunday, December 20, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 12/20 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 12/20/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice (BNC-PDF)
Friday, December 18, 2020
8 8 order Appear pro hac vice (BNC-PDF) Fri 12/18 3:35 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice; Applicant: Robert A. Rich (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/18/2020 (Lewis, Litaun)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 motion Appear pro hac vice (motion) Fri 12/18 6:27 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice /Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case (Robert A. Rich) Filed by Defendant Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Bobb, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
6 6 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 12/01 6:10 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: Smith & Nephew (Overseas) Limited, Smith & Nephew Consolidated, Inc., Smith & Nephew USD Limited, Smith & Nephew plc, TP Limited. Filed by Defendant Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Bobb, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/30 10:30 AM
Answer to Complaint /Smith & Nephew, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 549, and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 Filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc..(Bobb, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Monday, October 05, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Mon 10/05 9:28 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 4/25/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 10:29 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 9:06 PM
Summons Issued on Smith & Nephew, Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/26/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center
Saturday, August 29, 2020
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 08/29 3:16 AM
Receipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01561-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51650428. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 12:13 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01561. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center against Smith & Nephew, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet