Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-50133

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:20-ap-05031
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Aug 05, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
W.I.S.E. Underwriting Agency Limited
Represented By
W.I.S.E. Underwriting Agency Limited
contact info
Defendant
Talisman Casualty Insurance Company
7881 W Charleston Blvd Suite 210
Las Vegas, NV 89117
Represented By
Talisman Casualty Insurance Company
contact info
Plaintiff
OGGUSA, Inc.
OGGUSA, Inc. f/k/a GENCANNA GLOBAL USA, 321 Venable Rd, Ste 2
Winchester, KY 40391
Represented By
Michael J Barrie
contact info

GPO May 28 2021
Memorandum Opinion and Order GRANTING IN PART Renewed and Amended Motion to Strike Defendants Improper Objections to GenCannas Discovery Requests and Compel Defendants to Promptly Produce Requested Information and for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(RE: related document(s)117 Renewed and Amended Motion to Strike Defendants Improper Objections to GenCannas Discovery Requests and Compel Defendants to Promptly Produce Requested Information and for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 filed by Plaintiff OGGUSA, Inc.). (bjp)

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, August 05, 2022
court Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 08/05 9:27 AM
Adversary Proceeding 20-5031 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]