Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01577
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Jun 16, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cellco Partnership
One Verizon Way
Basking Ridge, NJ 07920
Represented By
Cellco Partnership
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Health System of California, Inc.
2040 E. Mariposa Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
14 14 court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/16 11:30 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1577 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc., Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Friday, May 14, 2021
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 05/14 9:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 05/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, May 13, 2021
12 12 notice Notice Thu 05/13 9:24 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
11 11 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 05/12 10:40 AM
Order Continuing Status Conference From May 18, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To August 17, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/12/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Friday, April 30, 2021
10 10 notice Notice Fri 04/30 11:37 AM
Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
9 9 misc Proof of service Thu 02/18 12:38 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center, Verity Health System of California, Inc.. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 23, 2021
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 01/23 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 01/23/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, January 21, 2021
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 01/21 4:07 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From January 26, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To May 18, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/21/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
6 6 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 01/12 2:47 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 4/25/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc., Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
5 5 misc Status report Tue 01/12 11:00 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center, Verity Health System of California, Inc. Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, October 02, 2020
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/02 10:43 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Cellco Partnership. (Hilton, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 11:27 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center, Verity Health System of California, Inc. Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 09/02 11:37 AM
Summons Issued on Cellco Partnership Date Issued 9/2/2020, Answer Due 10/2/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/26/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc., Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 1:44 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01577. Complaint by St. Francis Medical Center, Verity Health System of California, Inc., O'Connor Hospital, St. Vincent Medical Center against Cellco Partnership. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet