Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01588
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Apr 07, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
SourceHOV Healthcare, Inc.
2701 East Grauwyler Road
Irving, TX 75061
Represented By
SourceHOV Healthcare, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Saint Louise Regional Hospital
9400 No Name Uno
Gilroy, CA 95020
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Business Services
2040 E. Mariposa Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Medical Foundation
400 Race Street
San Jose, CA 95126
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
10 10 court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/07 12:02 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1588 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Verity Business Services, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
9 9 notice Notice Wed 04/07 8:22 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
8 8 misc Proof of service Thu 02/18 12:47 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Verity Business Services, Verity Medical Foundation. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 23, 2021
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 01/23 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 01/23/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, January 21, 2021
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 01/21 4:32 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From January 26, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To May 18, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/21/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Thursday, January 14, 2021
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Thu 01/14 2:32 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 4/25/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Verity Business Services, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
4 4 misc Status report Tue 01/12 8:53 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Verity Business Services, Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 11:41 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Verity Business Services, Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 09/02 11:45 AM
Summons Issued on SourceHOV Healthcare, Inc. Date Issued 9/2/2020, Answer Due 10/2/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/26/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Verity Business Services, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 2:46 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01588. Complaint by O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Verity Business Services, Verity Medical Foundation against SourceHOV Healthcare, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet