Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01589
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Mar 04, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Spectranetics LLC
9965 Federal Drive
Colorado Springs, CO 80921
Represented By
Spectranetics LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Seton Medical Center
1900 Sullivan Avenue
Daly City, CA 94015
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, March 04, 2021
10 10 court Close Adversary Case Thu 03/04 6:05 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1589 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
9 9 notice Notice Tue 02/09 1:15 PM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 23, 2021
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 01/23 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 01/23/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, January 21, 2021
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 01/21 4:51 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From January 26, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To May 4, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. In View Of Settlement (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/21/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Friday, January 08, 2021
6 6 court Hearing Set (Other) Fri 01/08 7:15 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 4/25/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center
5 5 notice Notice Fri 01/08 10:23 AM
Notice of Settlement. Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 02, 2020
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/02 12:39 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Spectranetics LLC. (Owens, Keith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 11:42 AM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 09/02 11:46 AM
Summons Issued on Spectranetics LLC Date Issued 9/2/2020, Answer Due 10/2/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/26/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 2:51 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01589. Complaint by St. Vincent Medical Center, O'Connor Hospital, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center against Spectranetics LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet