Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01602
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Feb 01, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Optum360, LLC
11000 Optum Circle
Eden Prairie, MN 55344
Represented By
Optum360, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Seton Medical Center
1900 Sullivan Avenue
Daly City, CA 94015
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Saint Louise Regional Hospital
9400 No Name Uno
Gilroy, CA 95020
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, February 01, 2021
15 15 court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/01 11:07 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1602 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
14 14 notice Notice Wed 01/13 11:31 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 08, 2021
13 13 notice Notice Fri 01/08 10:13 AM
Notice of Settlement. Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
12 12 misc Notice of Change of Address Wed 12/02 10:50 AM
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Defendant Optum360, LLC. (Montgomery, Susan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
11 11 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Tue 12/01 3:36 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other -PDF document was not flattened prior to filing. Instructions for flattening a PDF document are available on the courts website under CM/ECF Instructions to flatten PDF files. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE FLATTEN DOCUMENT IMMEDIATELY. Related [+] (Cowan, Sarah)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Change of Address filed by Defendant Optum360, LLC
10 10 misc Notice of Change of Address Tue 12/01 10:13 AM
Notice of Change of Address for Law Office of Susan I. Montgomery Filed by Defendant Optum360, LLC. (Montgomery, Susan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
9 9 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 11/30 12:15 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Attorney address on the answer does not match CM/ECF. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION ON THIS CASE, HOWEVER, THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE THE PROPER CHANGE OF ADDRESS, IF APPLICABLE. Related [+] WARNING: Address changed from 1925 Century Park East Ste 2000, Los Angeles, CA 90067 to 1100 Glendon Avenue, 15th FloorLos Angeles, CA 90024 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 8 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Optum360, LLC
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/30 10:15 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Optum360, LLC. (Montgomery, Susan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
7 7 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 09/22 6:53 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/17/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 5/31/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
Friday, September 18, 2020
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 09/18 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 09/18/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
5 5 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 12:05 PM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
4 4 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Wed 09/16 8:10 AM
Order Approving Stipulation To Extend Time To Respond To The Complaint (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 9/16/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
3 3 motion Stipulation (motion) Tue 09/15 4:16 PM
Stipulation By Optum360, LLC and Plaintiffs to extend time to respond to complaint Filed by Defendant Optum360, LLC (Montgomery, Susan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 9:37 PM
Summons Issued on Optum360, LLC Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/2/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1575, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 4:25 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01602. Complaint by Seton Medical Center, O'Connor Hospital, St. Vincent Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, Saint Louise Regional Hospital against Optum360, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet