Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01605
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:May 06, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Pacific Gas and Electric Company
77 Beale Street
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Pacific Gas and Electric Company
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Seton Medical Center
1900 Sullivan Avenue
Daly City, CA 94015
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Holdings, LLC
2040 E. Mariposa Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Medical Foundation
400 Race Street
San Jose, CA 95126
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Saint Louise Regional Hospital
9400 No Name Uno
Gilroy, CA 95020
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 06, 2021
12 12 court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/06 10:03 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1605 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
11 11 notice Notice Tue 04/20 8:07 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
10 10 misc Status report Tue 04/06 12:45 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, February 18, 2021
9 9 misc Proof of service Thu 02/18 12:52 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 01/29 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 01/29/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 01/27 4:02 PM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From February 2, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To April 20, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Requiring Defendant To Retain Counsel And To Answer The Complaint By No Later Than March 5, 2021 (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/27/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
6 6 misc Status report Tue 01/19 10:35 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
5 5 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 09/22 6:47 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/17/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 5/31/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
4 4 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 12:09 PM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Seton Medical Center, Verity Holdings, LLC, Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 09/01 9:21 AM
Summons Issued on Pacific Gas and Electric Company Date Issued 9/1/2020, Answer Due 10/1/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/2/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 9:39 PM
Summons Issued on Pacific Gas and Electric Company Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/2/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.) WARNING: Notice not mailed. See entry3 for correct summons. Modified on 9/1/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 4:44 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01605. Complaint by O'Connor Hospital, Seton Medical Center, Verity Holdings, LLC, Verity Medical Foundation, Saint Louise Regional Hospital against Pacific Gas and Electric Company. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet