Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01610
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Jun 16, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
7000 Cardinal Place
Dublin, OH 43017
Represented By
Cardinal Health, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Seton Medical Center
1900 Sullivan Avenue
Daly City, CA 94015
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Saint Louise Regional Hospital
9400 No Name Uno
Gilroy, CA 95020
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Health System of California, Inc.
2040 E. Mariposa Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, June 16, 2023
55 55 court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/16 3:06 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1610 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (LG)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc., Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
54 54 notice Notice Fri 06/16 11:54 AM
Notice Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 10, 2023
53 53 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 06/10 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 06/10/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 52 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)