Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01612
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Apr 15, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
MModal Services, Ltd.
1710 Murray Avenue Suite 2
Pittsburgh, PA 15217
Represented By
MModal Services, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Business Services
2040 E. Mariposa Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Seton Medical Center
1900 Sullivan Avenue
Daly City, CA 94015
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Health System of California, Inc.
2040 E. Mariposa Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 15, 2021
28 28 court Close Adversary Case Thu 04/15 11:36 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1612 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc., Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Verity Business Services
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
27 27 notice Notice Wed 03/31 8:27 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding That Does Not Involve Claims Under 11 USC Section 727 [FRBP 7041(a)]. Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 03/04 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 03/04/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
25 25 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Tue 03/02 7:48 AM
Order Approving Fifth Stipulation Extending Deadline For MModal Services, Ltd. To Respond To Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed By Verity Business Services, St. Vincent Medical Center, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, Verity Health System Of California, Inc., And O'connor Hospital The deadline for Defendant MModal Services, Ltd. to respond to the Adversary Proceeding Complaint shall be extended to April 19, 2021. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/2/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 24
Monday, March 01, 2021
24 24 motion Stipulation (motion) Mon 03/01 12:00 PM
Stipulation By MModal Services, Ltd. and Verity Business Services, St. Vincent Medical Center, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, Verity Health System of California, Inc., and OConnor Hospital Extending Deadline for MModal Services, Ltd. to Respond to Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed by Defendant MModal Services, Ltd. (Laurin, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
23 23 misc Proof of service Thu 02/18 12:54 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 01/29 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 01/29/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
21 21 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 01/27 3:19 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference From February 2, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To June 8, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/27/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
20 20 misc Status report Tue 01/19 8:20 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Saturday, January 09, 2021
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 01/09 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 01/09/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
18 18 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Wed 01/06 6:04 PM
Order Approving Fourth Stipulation Extending Deadline For Mmodal Services, LTD. To Respond To Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed By Verity Business Services, St. Vincent Medical Center, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, Verity Health System Of California, Inc., And O'connor Hospital (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/6/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 17
17 17 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 01/06 11:28 AM
Stipulation By MModal Services, Ltd. and Verity Business Services, St. Vincent Medical Center, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, Verity Health System of California, Inc., and OConnor Hospital Filed by Defendant MModal Services, Ltd. (Laurin, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 04, 2020
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 12/04 9:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 12/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
15 15 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Wed 12/02 2:58 PM
Order Approving Third Stipulation Extending Deadline For Mmodal Services, LTD. To Respond To Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed By Verity Business Services, St. Vincent Medical Center, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, Verity Health System Of California, Inc., And O'connor Hospital (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/2/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 14
14 14 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 12/02 12:49 PM
Stipulation By MModal Services, Ltd. and Verity Business Services, St. Vincent Medical Center, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, Verity Health System of California, Inc. and O'Connor Hospital Filed by Defendant MModal Services, Ltd. (Laurin, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 11/04 9:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 11/04/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Monday, November 02, 2020
12 12 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 11/02 11:46 AM
Order Approving Second Stipulation Extending Deadline For MMODALl Services, Ltd. To Respond To Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed By Verity Business Services, St. Vincent Medical Center, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, Verity Health System Of California, Inc., And O'connor Hospital (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 11/2/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, October 29, 2020
11 11 misc Notice of Lodgment Thu 10/29 12:13 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order Filed by Defendant MModal Services, Ltd. Related [+]. (Laurin, Paul)
Related: [-] 10 Stipulation By MModal Services, Ltd. and Verity Business Services, St. Vincent Medical Center, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, Verity Health System of California, Inc., and OConnor Hospital Extending Deadline for MModal Services, Ltd. to Respond to Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed by Defendant MModal Services, Ltd. filed by Defendant MModal Services, Ltd.
10 10 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 10/29 12:09 PM
Stipulation By MModal Services, Ltd. and Verity Business Services, St. Vincent Medical Center, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, Verity Health System of California, Inc., and OConnor Hospital Extending Deadline for MModal Services, Ltd. to Respond to Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed by Defendant MModal Services, Ltd. (Laurin, Paul)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 27, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 09/27 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 09/27/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)
Friday, September 25, 2020
8 8 order Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF) Fri 09/25 5:12 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Extending Deadline For MModal Services, Ltd. To Respond To Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed By Verity Business Services, St. Vincent Medical Center, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, Verity Health System Of California, Inc., And O'connor Hospital (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 9/25/2020 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 6
7 7 misc Notice of Lodgment Fri 09/25 1:52 PM
Notice of lodgment --Proposed Order Approving Stipulation Extending Deadline for MModal Services, Ltd. to Respond to Adversary Proceeding Complaint Filed by Verity Business Services, St. Vincent Medical Center, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, Verity Health System of California, Inc., and O'Connor Hospital Filed by Defendant MModal Services, Ltd. Related [+]. (Laurin, Paul)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation By MModal Services, Ltd. and ASK LLP Filed by Defendant MModal Services, Ltd. filed by Defendant MModal Services, Ltd.
6 6 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 09/25 1:45 PM
Stipulation By MModal Services, Ltd. and ASK LLP Filed by Defendant MModal Services, Ltd. (Laurin, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 09/25 1:42 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice -- Notice of Appearance for MModal Services, Ltd. by Paul J Laurin Filed by Defendant MModal Services, Ltd.. (Laurin, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 09/22 6:41 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/17/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 5/31/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc., Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Verity Business Services
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 12:18 PM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center, Verity Business Services, Verity Health System of California, Inc. Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 9:45 PM
Summons Issued on MModal Services, Ltd. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/2/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Verity Health System of California, Inc., Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Verity Business Services
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 5:38 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01612. Complaint by Verity Business Services, St. Vincent Medical Center, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, Verity Health System of California, Inc., O'Connor Hospital against MModal Services, Ltd.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet