Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-20151

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:20-ap-01613
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2020
Terminated:Jul 20, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Stericycle, Inc.
2355 Waukegan Road
Bannockburn, IL 60015
Represented By
Stericycle, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Verity Medical Foundation
400 Race Street
San Jose, CA 95126
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Seton Medical Center
1900 Sullivan Avenue
Daly City, CA 94015
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
O'Connor Hospital
2105 Forest Avenue
San Jose, CA 95128
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Vincent Medical Center
2131 West Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90057
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
St. Francis Medical Center
3630 East Imperial Highway
Lynwood, CA 90262
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Saint Louise Regional Hospital
9400 No Name Uno
Gilroy, CA 95020
Represented By
Tania M Moyron
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
15 15 court Close Adversary Case Tue 07/20 11:09 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-1613 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
14 14 notice Notice Wed 06/30 6:35 AM
Notice of Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 06/09 9:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 06/09/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 ORDER to continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF)
Monday, June 07, 2021
12 12 order Continue/reschedule hearing (BNC-PDF) Mon 06/07 9:37 AM
Order continuing status conference from June 8, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. to November 16, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 6/7/2021 (Lewis, Litaun)
Related: [-] doc
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
11 11 misc Status report Tue 05/25 8:09 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/02 11:09 AM
Answer to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 549, and 550 and to Disallow Claims pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502; proof of service Filed by Stericycle, Inc.. (Raanan, Uzzi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
9 9 misc Proof of service Thu 02/18 12:55 PM
Proof of service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures and First Set Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 01/28 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 01/28/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 01/26 3:01 PM
Order: (1) Continuing Status Conference From February 2, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. To June 8, 2021 At 10:00 A.M. And (2) Overruling Defendant's Objection To The Bankruptcy Court's Entry Of Final Judgment (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/26/2021 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] doc
Thursday, January 21, 2021
6 6 misc Status report Thu 01/21 6:28 AM
Status report (Amended) Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
5 5 misc Status report Wed 01/20 8:15 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Howard Grobstein, Liquidating Trustee for the VHS Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 09/22 6:39 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/17/2022 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 5/31/2022 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
3 3 misc Proof of service Wed 09/16 12:19 PM
Proof of service of Complaint, Summons, Order Establishing Procedures for the Issuance of Scheduling Orders and Orders Regarding Courtroom Procedures in Connection with Avoidance Actions, Scheduling Order, Revised Early Meeting of Counsel, Joint Status Conference Instructions; and Order Re: Courtroom Procedures Filed by Plaintiffs O'Connor Hospital, Saint Louise Regional Hospital, Seton Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, St. Vincent Medical Center, Verity Medical Foundation Related [+]. (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Att: 1 Order Re: Courtroom Procedures
Att: 2 Scheduling Order
Monday, August 31, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 08/31 9:45 PM
Summons Issued on Stericycle, Inc. Date Issued 8/31/2020, Answer Due 9/30/2020 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/2/2021 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff St. Francis Medical Center, Plaintiff St. Vincent Medical Center, Plaintiff Verity Medical Foundation, Plaintiff O'Connor Hospital, Plaintiff Seton Medical Center, Plaintiff Saint Louise Regional Hospital
Friday, August 28, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/28 5:43 PM
Adversary case 2:20-ap-01613. Complaint by Verity Medical Foundation, Seton Medical Center, O'Connor Hospital, St. Vincent Medical Center, St. Francis Medical Center, Saint Louise Regional Hospital against Stericycle, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Moyron, Tania)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet