Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:20-bk-34500
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2020
Terminated:Mar 30, 2021
Plan Confirmed:Oct 14, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
iQor Holdings Inc.
200 Central Ave Fl 7
St Petersburg, FL 33701-3566
Represented By
Vienna Flores Anaya
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Jennifer F Wertz
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Matthew D Cavenaugh
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Stephen Douglas Statham
Office Of Us Trustee
contact info
Hector Duran, Jr
U.S. Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
347 347 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/08 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 19. Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 345 Generic Order
346 346 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/08 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 19. Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 344 Generic Order
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Wed 05/07 9:18 AM
All motions, responses, documents or other pleadings that pertain to disputes concerning Jackson Walker or former Bankruptcy Judge David Jones should be filed in District Court Case Number 4:23cv4787 (dah4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
345 345 order Generic Order Tue 05/06 3:08 PM
Order Referring Various Matters to Judge Lopez signed by Chief Judge Alia Moses on 5/6/2025 (dah4)
Related: [-]