Member Case
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-34500

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:20-bk-34496
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2020
Terminated:Mar 30, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
THC Holdings, Inc.
200 Central Ave Fl 7
St Petersburg, FL 33701-3566
Represented By
Vienna Flores Anaya
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Monday, January 22, 2024
7 7 trustee Remark (batch) Mon 01/22 2:47 PM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez randomly reassigned and added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated . (DawnaKelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 04/16 2:20 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed per Order #318 in 20-34500 (ltie)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 12, 2020
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/12 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/12/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order for Joint Administration
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/12 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/12/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Friday, September 11, 2020
4 4 court No Creditor Mailing List Fri 09/11 10:49 AM
No Creditor Mailing List (JosephWellsadi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2020
3 3 order Joint Administration Thu 09/10 11:02 AM
Order for Joint Administration under 20-34500 Signed on 9/10/2020 (aaloadi)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists Thu 09/10 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
1 1 43 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Thu 09/10 2:24 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by THC Holdings, Inc.. (Anaya, Vienna)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Thu 09/10 11:02 AM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 20-34500 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aaloadi)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 09/10 2:30 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-34496 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22419057. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]