Miller v. Coal, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-20086
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-20086
Wyoming Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Cathleen D Parker |
Case #: | 2:20-ap-02030 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 11, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 22, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Coal, LLC
5260 South 1650 West
Rexburg, ID 83440 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David L. Miller
McKay, Burton & Thurman, P.C. 15 West South Temple Suite 1000
Salt Lake City, UT 84101 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:06 PM MDT |
Tuesday, November 22, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 11/22 8:46 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-2030 Closed . (tsm) |
||
Wednesday, November 09, 2022 | ||
44 | 44
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/09/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2022 | ||
43 | 43
![]() Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (tsm) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2022 | ||
42 | 42
![]() Proposed Order . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian) |
|
41 | 41
![]() Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian) |
|
Sunday, March 06, 2022 | ||
40 | 40
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/06/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 04, 2022 | ||
39 | 39
![]() Scheduling Order . Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/9/2022 at 09:30 AM at Telephone Conference. Trial date set for 11/15/2022 at 09:00 AM at 2120 Capitol Avenue, Bankruptcy Courtroom, 8th Floor, Cheyenne, WY 82001. (tsm) |
|
Thursday, February 10, 2022 | ||
38 | 38
![]() Pre-Status Conference Report. Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian) |
|
Saturday, January 29, 2022 | ||
37 | 37
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/29/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 27, 2022 | ||
36 | 36
![]() Order Requiring Written Discovery Plan . Compliance due by 3/3/2022. (tsm) |
|
Thursday, November 25, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/25/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, November 23, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
![]() Order on Motions for Summary Judgment (dxj) |
|
Wednesday, October 20, 2021 | ||
33 | 33
![]() Minutes of Hearing Held . (tsm) |
|
Wednesday, October 13, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
![]() PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/13/2021 10:43:34 AM ]. File Size [ 22761 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:47:25 ]. (admin) |
|
Friday, September 03, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 01, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Order Scheduling Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment . Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 at 09:30 AM at Telephone Conference. (dxj) |
|
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Reply to Filed by Coal, LLC (McCartney, Ken) |
|
Friday, June 11, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Objection to . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian) |
|
Thursday, May 20, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/20/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, May 18, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Supplemental Response to Motion for Summary Judgment (dxj) |
|
Friday, May 14, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Proposed Order . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, April 28, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Response to Filed by Coal, LLC (McCartney, Ken) |
|
Friday, April 23, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Motion to Extend Time to File Supplemental Response to Motion for Summary Judgment . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, March 17, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Notice to Take Deposition of Timothy J. Glick . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Notice to Take Deposition of Dynamic Custom Homes, LLC . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian) |
|
Monday, March 08, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Notice to Take Deposition of Defendant Coal, LLC . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Notice re: Issuance of Subpoena to Wyatt J. Wachtel . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Notice re: Notice of Issuance of Subpoena to Alison A. Wachtel . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian) |
|
Thursday, December 31, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Supplemental Motion For Summary Judgment . Filed by Coal, LLC (McCartney, Ken) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 23, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Notice re: Notice of Issuance of Subpoena to Dynamic Custom Homes, LLC . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Notice re: of Issuance of Subpoena to Timothy J. Glick . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, December 02, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
![]() PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/2/2020 10:34:01 AM ]. File Size [ 3751 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:49 ]. (admin) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Minutes of Hearing Held . (dxj) |
|
Monday, November 30, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Affidavit Re: in support of summary judgment . Filed by Coal, LLC (McCartney, Ken) |
|
Wednesday, November 18, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/18/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Order Scheduling Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment . Hearing scheduled for 12/2/2020 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Conference. (dxj) |
|
Tuesday, November 03, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Response to Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Amended Answer to Complaint to clarify counsel represents the Defendant not the Debtor Filed by Coal, LLC (McCartney, Ken) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Motion For Summary Judgment . Filed by Coal, LLC (McCartney, Ken) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Coal, LLC (McCartney, Ken) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Service Executed on Coal, LLC 9/14/2020. (Porter, Brian) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued on Coal, LLC Date Issued 9/11/2020, Answer Due 10/13/2020. (cxy) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 09/11 3:55 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-02030 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2270641. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-02030 ADVERSARY COMPLAINT - Nature of Suit (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) - by Plaintiff(s) David L. Miller against Defendant(s) Coal, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (Porter, Brian) |