Wyoming Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Cathleen D Parker
Case #: 2:20-bk-20086
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2020
Creditor Meeting:Apr 17, 2020
Terminated:Nov 01, 2023

Debtor
DYNAMIC CUSTOM HOMES LLC
175 NW RIDGE ROAD
JACKSON, WY 83001
Represented By
Ken McCartney
The Law Offices Of Ken Mccartney, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
David L. Miller
David L. Miller PC PO Box 9
Farmington, UT 84025
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
308 West 21st Street, 2nd Floor
Cheyenne, WY 82001


Docket last updated: 03/05/2020 12:00 AM MST
Wednesday, March 04, 2020
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 03/04 4:31 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual . Fee Amount $335 Filed by DYNAMIC CUSTOM HOMES LLC (McCartney, Ken)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 03/04 4:36 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 20-20086 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2215691. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 court Corp/Ptnr Resolution Wed 03/04 4:43 PM
Corporation/Partnership Resolution Filed. Filed by DYNAMIC CUSTOM HOMES LLC (McCartney, Ken)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Wed 03/04 4:47 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/17/2020 at 10:00 AM at Patterson Visitor Center, 1432 Main St, Evanston, WY, 82930. (McCartney, Ken)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Wed 03/04 4:52 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor . Filed by DYNAMIC CUSTOM HOMES LLC (McCartney, Ken)
Related: [-]