Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-20086

Wyoming Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Cathleen D Parker
Case #: 2:20-ap-02031
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2020
Terminated:Nov 22, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Tonks Masonry, Inc.
3205 Shingle Tree Drive
Jackson, WY 83001
Represented By
Tonks Masonry, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
David L. Miller
McKay, Burton & Thurman, P.C. 15 West South Temple, Suite 1000
Salt Lake City, UT 84101
Represented By
Brian J. Porter
Mckay Burton & Thurman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:06 PM MDT
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/22 8:49 AM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-2031 Closed . (tsm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
47 47 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 11/09 10:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/09/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 46 Order Dismissing Debtor(s)
Monday, November 07, 2022
46 46 order Dismissing Debtor(s) Mon 11/07 1:39 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (tsm)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
45 45 misc Proposed Order Fri 11/04 3:32 PM
Proposed Order Related [+]. Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-] 44 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
44 44 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 11/04 3:31 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 06, 2022
43 43 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 03/06 10:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/06/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 42 Scheduling Order
Friday, March 04, 2022
42 42 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/04 2:08 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/9/2022 at 09:30 AM at Telephone Conference. Trial date set for 11/15/2022 at 09:00 AM at 2120 Capitol Avenue, Bankruptcy Courtroom, 8th Floor, Cheyenne, WY 82001. (dxj)
Related: [-] 41 Notice
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
41 41 misc Notice Tue 02/15 12:25 PM
Notice re: Proposed Discovery Plan Related [+]. Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-] 39 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Saturday, January 29, 2022
40 40 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 01/29 10:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/29/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 39 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Thursday, January 27, 2022
39 39 order Regarding Compliance With Rules Thu 01/27 2:52 PM
Order Requiring Written Discovery Plan Related [+]. Compliance due by 3/3/2022. (tsm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, November 25, 2021
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 11/25 10:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/25/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 37 Order on Motion For Summary Judgment
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
37 37 order Summary Judgment Tue 11/23 2:30 PM
Order on Motions for Summary Judgment Related [+] (dxj)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
36 36 court Minutes of Proceedings Wed 10/20 10:16 AM
Minutes of Hearing Held Related [+]. (tsm)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Summary Judgment
Wednesday, October 13, 2021
35 35 audio Wed 10/13 6:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/13/2021 10:43:50 AM ]. File Size [ 22761 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:47:25 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 09/03 10:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Order Scheduling Hearing
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
33 33 order Scheduling Hearing Wed 09/01 3:28 PM
Order Scheduling Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 at 09:30 AM at Telephone Conference. (dxj)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Summary Judgment
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
32 32 answer Reply Tue 06/22 2:19 PM
Reply to Related [+] Filed by Tonks Masonry, Inc. (McCartney, Ken)
Related: [-] 31 Objection to filed by Plaintiff David L. Miller
Friday, June 11, 2021
31 31 misc Objection to Fri 06/11 12:55 PM
Objection to Related [+]. Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Summary Judgment,18 Motion for Summary Judgment
Sunday, May 23, 2021
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 05/23 10:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/23/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Clerks Certificate of Service
Friday, May 21, 2021
29 29 court Clerks Certificate of Service Fri 05/21 8:03 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Service Related [+]. (dcsl)
Related: [-] 27 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, May 20, 2021
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 05/20 10:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/20/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
27 27 order Extend Time Tue 05/18 3:14 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Supplemental Response to Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+] (tsm)
Related: [-] 24
Friday, May 14, 2021
26 26 misc Proposed Order Fri 05/14 4:10 PM
Proposed Order Related [+]. Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
25 25 answer Response Wed 04/28 11:38 AM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Tonks Masonry, Inc. (McCartney, Ken)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Extend Time to File Supplemental Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff David L. Miller
Friday, April 23, 2021
24 24 motion Extend Time Fri 04/23 5:06 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Supplemental Response to Motion for Summary Judgment . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
23 23 misc Notice to Take Deposition Wed 03/17 2:55 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Timothy J. Glick . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Notice to Take Deposition Wed 03/17 2:54 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Dynamic Custom Homes, LLC . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
21 21 misc Notice to Take Deposition Thu 03/11 1:47 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Tonks Masonry, Inc . Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
20 20 misc Notice Mon 02/01 5:39 PM
Notice re: Issuance of Subpoena to Wyatt J. Wachtel Related [+]. Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-] 12 Minutes of Adversary Proceedings
19 19 misc Notice Mon 02/01 5:38 PM
Notice re: Issuance of Subpoena to Alison A. Wachtel Related [+]. Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-] 12 Minutes of Adversary Proceedings
Thursday, December 31, 2020
18 18 motion Summary Judgment Thu 12/31 8:37 AM
Supplemental Motion For Summary Judgment . Filed by Tonks Masonry, Inc. (McCartney, Ken)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 aFFIDAVIT NO 3 OF TIM GLIICK
Att: 2 EXHIBIT 3 A TONKS PAYMENT
Att: 3 EXHIBIT 3 B DRAW REQUEST PAGES
Att: 4 EXHIBIT 3 C OWNERS PAYMENT ON DRAW REQUEST
Wednesday, December 23, 2020
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/23 3:58 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests Related [+]. Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-] 12 Minutes of Adversary Proceedings
16 16 misc Notice Wed 12/23 3:57 PM
Notice re: Notice of Subpoena Issued to Timothy J. Glick Related [+]. Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-] 12 Minutes of Adversary Proceedings
15 15 misc Notice Wed 12/23 3:55 PM
Notice re: Notice of Subpoena to Dynamic Custom Homes, LLC Related [+]. Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-] 12 Minutes of Adversary Proceedings
14 14 misc Subpoena Issued Wed 12/23 3:51 PM
***DISREGARD*** Subpoena Issued. Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian) Modified on 12/23/2020 per phone conversation with Brian Porter (dcsl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
13 13 audio Wed 12/02 6:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/2/2020 10:45:34 AM ]. File Size [ 3751 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:49 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
12 12 court Minutes of Adversary Proceedings Wed 12/02 4:29 PM
Minutes of Hearing Held Related [+]. (tsm)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Summary Judgment
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
11 11 misc Affidavit Wed 11/25 8:24 AM
Affidavit Re: IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT Related [+]. Filed by Tonks Masonry, Inc. (McCartney, Ken)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Summary Judgment
Wednesday, November 18, 2020
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 11/18 10:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/18/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Scheduling Hearing
Monday, November 16, 2020
9 9 order Scheduling Hearing Mon 11/16 4:39 PM
Order Scheduling Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgmen Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 12/2/2020 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Conference. (dxj)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Summary Judgment
Tuesday, November 03, 2020
8 8 answer Response Tue 11/03 3:24 PM
Response to Related [+] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-] 6 Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Tonks Masonry, Inc.
Att: 1 Affidavit of Mark C. Rose
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/14 10:37 AM
Amended Answer to Complaint to clarify counsel represetns dthe Defendant not the debtor Filed by Tonks Masonry, Inc. (McCartney, Ken)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 13, 2020
6 6 motion Summary Judgment Tue 10/13 2:52 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment . Filed by Tonks Masonry, Inc. (McCartney, Ken)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Tonks Affidavit
Att: 2 glick Affidavit
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/13 2:51 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Tonks Masonry, Inc. (McCartney, Ken)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 09/15 3:34 PM
Summons Service Executed on Tonks Masonry, Inc. 9/14/2020. (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 09/11 6:24 PM
Summons Issued on Tonks Masonry, Inc. Date Issued 9/11/2020, Answer Due 10/13/2020. (cxy)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 09/11 4:11 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-02031 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2270665. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/11 4:11 PM
Adversary case 20-02031 ADVERSARY COMPLAINT - Nature of Suit (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) - by Plaintiff(s) David L. Miller against Defendant(s) Tonks Masonry, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-]