Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-20086

Wyoming Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Cathleen D Parker
Case #: 2:20-ap-02032
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2020
Terminated:Jan 28, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Brady's Inc.
1445 East Lincoln Road
Idaho Falls, ID 83401
Represented By
Brady's Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
David L. Miller
McKay, Burton & Thurman, P.C. 15 West South Temple Suite 1000
Salt Lake City, UT 84101
Represented By
Brian J. Porter
Mckay Burton & Thurman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:06 PM MDT
Thursday, January 28, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/28 2:52 PM
Adversary Case 2:20-ap-2032 Closed . (tsm)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 06, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 11/06 10:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/06/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Dismissing Case
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
8 8 order Dismissing Case Wed 11/04 11:10 AM
Order Confirming Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (ECF No. 5) . (tsm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
7 7 motion Summary Judgment Mon 10/05 12:41 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment . Filed by Brady's Inc. (McCartney, Ken)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of SJ
6 6 answer Response Mon 10/05 12:32 PM
Response to Related [+] Answer to Complaint Filed by Brady's Inc. (McCartney, Ken)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff David L. Miller
Att: 1 cash register receipt
Thursday, October 01, 2020
5 5 misc Notice Thu 10/01 1:47 PM
Notice re: Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Filed by David L. Miller (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 09/15 3:43 PM
Summons Service Executed on Brady's Inc. 9/14/2020. (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 11, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 09/11 6:25 PM
Summons Issued on Brady's Inc. Date Issued 9/11/2020, Answer Due 10/13/2020. (cxy)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 09/11 4:15 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-02032 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2270676. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/11 4:15 PM
Adversary case 20-02032 ADVERSARY COMPLAINT - Nature of Suit (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) - by Plaintiff(s) David L. Miller against Defendant(s) Brady's Inc.. Fee Amount $350. (Porter, Brian)
Related: [-]