Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Timothy D Degiusti
Referred: Gary M Purcell
Case #: 5:20-cv-00944
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2020
Re-opened:Feb 23, 2022
Terminated:Dec 21, 2020

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
143 143 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/22 12:25 PM
ORDER granting141 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Margaret Hagen terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/22/2025. (naa)
Related: [-]
142 142 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/22 12:24 PM
ORDER granting140 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Annie Chiang terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/22/2025. (naa)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
141 141 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/21 9:46 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Margaret Hagen by Dwain Edward Thomas.(Hagen, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Proposed Ordee
Friday, April 18, 2025
140 140 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 04/18 9:02 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Annie Chiang by Dwain Edward Thomas.(Chiang, Annie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order