Original Case: 5:20-cv-00944

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-pr-06011
Typeprisoner appeal / state / civil rights
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2021
Terminated:Feb 01, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 07, 2023 8:20 AM MST
Amicus Curiae
CAMPAIGN FOR THE FAIR SENTENCING OF YOUTH
Represented By
Colleen McElroy
DLA Piper
contact info
Brendan Krasinski
DLA Piper
contact info
Jody Rhodes
DLA Piper
contact info
Rebecca Turner
Campaign for the Fair Sentencing of Youth
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KEVIN STITT, Governor
Defendant - Appellee
STEVEN BICKLEY, Executive Director of the Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board
Defendant - Appellee
T. HASTINGS SIEGFRIED, Chair of the Oklahoma Board of Corrections
Defendant - Appellee
SCOTT CROW, Director of the Oklahoma Department of Corrections
Plaintiff - Appellant
DWAIN EDWARD THOMAS
Represented By
Easha Anand
Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center
contact info
C. Harker Rhodes IV
Kirkland & Ellis
contact info
Lauren Nicole Beebe
Kirkland & Ellis
contact info

GPO Feb 01 2022
[10889871] Vacated and Remanded. Terminated on the merits after submissions without oral hearing. Written, signed, unpublished; Judges Holmes, Phillips (authoring judge) and Eid. Mandate to issue. [21-6011]

Docket last updated: 02/07/2023 8:20 AM MST
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
[10802936] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/26/2021. Fee or 1915 forms due 02/25/2021 for Dwain Edward Thomas. Notice of appearance due on 02/25/2021 for Dwain Edward Thomas. 21-6011 --[Edited 01/28/2021 by KLP to attach a corrected preliminary record (fixes file stamp on the notice of appeal).]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 58 pgs Transmittal letter and preliminary record
Att: 2 2 pgs New General Dkt Letter - Pro Se