Iowa Northern District Court
Judge:Linda R Reade
Case #: 6:20-cv-02079
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2020
Terminated:Dec 28, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 31, 2021 4:00 AM CDT
Amicus
Public Citizen
Represented By
Adam R Pulver
Public Citizen
contact info
Jay Madison Smith
Smith & Mcelwain Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Stephen R Stouffer
Represented By
Kevin J Driscoll
Finley Alt Smith Scharnberg Craig Hilmes & Gaffney, PC
contact info
Christopher S Coleman
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Tamara K Hackmann
Finley Law Firm
contact info
Mary Z Gaston
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc
Represented By
Kevin J Driscoll
Finley Alt Smith Scharnberg Craig Hilmes & Gaffney, PC
contact info
Christopher S Coleman
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Tamara K Hackmann
Finley Law Firm
contact info
Mary Z Gaston
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tyson Foods, Inc
Represented By
Kevin J Driscoll
Finley Alt Smith Scharnberg Craig Hilmes & Gaffney, PC
contact info
Christopher S Coleman
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Tamara K Hackmann
Finley Law Firm
contact info
Mary Z Gaston
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bret Tapken
Represented By
Kevin J Driscoll
Finley Alt Smith Scharnberg Craig Hilmes & Gaffney, PC
contact info
Nicholas A Klinefeldt
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Casey
Represented By
Kevin J Driscoll
Finley Alt Smith Scharnberg Craig Hilmes & Gaffney, PC
contact info
Nicholas A Klinefeldt
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
Cody Brustkern
Represented By
Kevin J Driscoll
Finley Alt Smith Scharnberg Craig Hilmes & Gaffney, PC
contact info
Nicholas A Klinefeldt
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
Noel W White
Represented By
Kevin J Driscoll
Finley Alt Smith Scharnberg Craig Hilmes & Gaffney, PC
contact info
Christopher S Coleman
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Tamara K Hackmann
Finley Law Firm
contact info
Mary Z Gaston
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
John H Tyson
Represented By
Kevin J Driscoll
Finley Alt Smith Scharnberg Craig Hilmes & Gaffney, PC
contact info
Christopher S Coleman
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Tamara K Hackmann
Finley Law Firm
contact info
Mary Z Gaston
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dean Banks
Represented By
Kevin J Driscoll
Finley Alt Smith Scharnberg Craig Hilmes & Gaffney, PC
contact info
Christopher S Coleman
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Tamara K Hackmann
Finley Law Firm
contact info
Mary Z Gaston
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tom Hart
Represented By
Christopher S Coleman
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Tamara K Hackmann
Finley Law Firm
contact info
Mary Z Gaston
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Nicholas A Klinefeldt
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tom Brower
Represented By
Kevin J Driscoll
Finley Alt Smith Scharnberg Craig Hilmes & Gaffney, PC
contact info
Christopher S Coleman
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Tamara K Hackmann
Finley Law Firm
contact info
Mary Z Gaston
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Oscar Fernandez
Represented By
Gabriel Phillips
The Spence Law Firm, LLC
contact info
John Jay Rausch
Rausch Law Firm PLLC
contact info
George Bryan Ulmer, III
The Spence Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Mel C Orchard, III
The Spence Law Firm LLC
contact info
Thomas P Frerichs
Frerichs Law Office PC
contact info
Thomas Frerichs
Frerichs Law Office PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Mary A Oleksiuk
Terminated: 11/12/2020
Represented By
Kevin J Driscoll
Finley Alt Smith Scharnberg Craig Hilmes & Gaffney, PC
contact info
Christopher S Coleman
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Tamara K Hackmann
Finley Law Firm
contact info
Mary Z Gaston
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ramiz Muheljic
Terminated: 11/12/2020
Represented By
Kevin J Driscoll
Finley Alt Smith Scharnberg Craig Hilmes & Gaffney, PC
contact info
Christopher S Coleman
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Tamara K Hackmann
Finley Law Firm
contact info
Mary Z Gaston
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
James Hook
Terminated: 11/12/2020
Represented By
Kevin J Driscoll
Finley Alt Smith Scharnberg Craig Hilmes & Gaffney, PC
contact info
Christopher S Coleman
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Tamara K Hackmann
Finley Law Firm
contact info
Mary Z Gaston
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
John/Jane 1-10 Does
Terminated: 11/12/2020
Represented By
Mary Z Gaston
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
Elizabeth Croston
Terminated: 11/12/2020
Represented By
Kevin J Driscoll
Finley Alt Smith Scharnberg Craig Hilmes & Gaffney, PC
contact info
Christopher S Coleman
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Tamara K Hackmann
Finley Law Firm
contact info
Mary Z Gaston
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
Missia Abad Bernal
Terminated: 11/12/2020
Represented By
Kevin J Driscoll
Finley Alt Smith Scharnberg Craig Hilmes & Gaffney, PC
contact info
Christopher S Coleman
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Tamara K Hackmann
Finley Law Firm
contact info
Mary Z Gaston
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hamdija Beganovic
Terminated: 11/12/2020
Represented By
Kevin J Driscoll
Finley Alt Smith Scharnberg Craig Hilmes & Gaffney, PC
contact info
Christopher S Coleman
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Tamara K Hackmann
Finley Law Firm
contact info
Mary Z Gaston
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
64 64 appeal Writ of Certiorari DENIED - Supreme Court Wed 02/22 9:00 AM
WRIT of Certiorari Denied by US Supreme Court MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to58 Notice of Appeal in 6:20-cv-02055-LRR-KEM filed by Cody Brustkern, Tom Brower, James Hook, Stephen R Stouffer, Tyson Foods, Inc, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc, Bret Tapken, John H Tyson, Tom Hart, Noel W White, Dean Banks, John Casey and50 Notice of Appeal in 6:20-cv-02079-LRR-KEM filed by Cody Brustkern, Tom Brower, Stephen R Stouffer, Tyson Foods, Inc, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc, Bret Tapken, John H Tyson, Tom Hart, Noel W White, Dean Banks, John Casey. (pac)
Related: [-]