Original Case: 6:20-cv-02079

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-01012
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2021
Terminated:Dec 30, 2021
Last checked: Friday Dec 31, 2021 2:29 AM CST
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of New Mexico
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Maryland
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Delaware
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Minnesota
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Colorado
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Connecticut
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Hawaii
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Illinois
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Maine
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Michigan
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Nevada
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of California
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of New York
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Oregon
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Pennsylvania
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Rhode Island
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Washington
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Wisconsin
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
District of Columbia
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
United States
Represented By
Michael Raab
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Lindsey Powell
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
Public Justice
Represented By
Karla Gilbride
PUBLIC JUSTICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
State of Massachusetts
Represented By
Silas Shawver
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Anna Kirsch
ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
contact info
Amicus on Behalf of Appellee(s)
United Food and Commercial Workers International Union
Represented By
Joey Hipolito
UNITED FOOD & COMMERCIAL WORKERS
contact info
Sarai King
UNITED FOOD & COMMERCIAL WORKERS
contact info
Jay Madison Smith
SMITH & MCELWAIN
contact info
Defendant
Hamdija Beganovic
Defendant
Mary Oleksiuk
Defendant
Elizabeth Croston
Defendant
James Hook
Defendant
Ramiz Muheljic
Defendant
Missia Abad Bernal
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1-10
Defendant - Appellant
Cody Brustkern
Represented By
David Yoshimura
FAEGRE & DRINKER
contact info
Nicholas A. Klinefeldt
FAEGRE & DRINKER
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
John Casey
Represented By
David Yoshimura
FAEGRE & DRINKER
contact info
Nicholas A. Klinefeldt
FAEGRE & DRINKER
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Tom Hart
Represented By
David Yoshimura
FAEGRE & DRINKER
contact info
Nicholas A. Klinefeldt
FAEGRE & DRINKER
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Bret Tapken
Represented By
David Yoshimura
FAEGRE & DRINKER
contact info
Nicholas A. Klinefeldt
FAEGRE & DRINKER
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By
Paul D. Clement
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Christopher S. Coleman
PERKINS & COIE
contact info
Erin Murphy
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Mary Z. Gaston
PERKINS & COIE
contact info
Kevin J. Driscoll
FINLEY LAW FIRM
contact info
C. Harker Rhodes IV
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Tom Brower
Represented By
Paul D. Clement
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Christopher S. Coleman
PERKINS & COIE
contact info
Tamara Hackmann
FINLEY & ALT
contact info
Erin Murphy
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Mary Z. Gaston
PERKINS & COIE
contact info
Kevin J. Driscoll
FINLEY LAW FIRM
contact info
C. Harker Rhodes IV
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Stephen R. Stouffer
Represented By
Paul D. Clement
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Christopher S. Coleman
PERKINS & COIE
contact info
Tamara Hackmann
FINLEY & ALT
contact info
Erin Murphy
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Mary Z. Gaston
PERKINS & COIE
contact info
Kevin J. Driscoll
FINLEY LAW FIRM
contact info
C. Harker Rhodes IV
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Dean Banks
Represented By
Paul D. Clement
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Christopher S. Coleman
PERKINS & COIE
contact info
Tamara Hackmann
FINLEY & ALT
contact info
Erin Murphy
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Mary Z. Gaston
PERKINS & COIE
contact info
Kevin J. Driscoll
FINLEY LAW FIRM
contact info
C. Harker Rhodes IV
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Noel W. White
Represented By
Paul D. Clement
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Christopher S. Coleman
PERKINS & COIE
contact info
Tamara Hackmann
FINLEY & ALT
contact info
Erin Murphy
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Mary Z. Gaston
PERKINS & COIE
contact info
Kevin J. Driscoll
FINLEY LAW FIRM
contact info
C. Harker Rhodes IV
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
John H. Tyson
Represented By
Paul D. Clement
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Christopher S. Coleman
PERKINS & COIE
contact info
Tamara Hackmann
FINLEY & ALT
contact info
Erin Murphy
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Mary Z. Gaston
PERKINS & COIE
contact info
Kevin J. Driscoll
FINLEY LAW FIRM
contact info
C. Harker Rhodes IV
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Represented By
Paul D. Clement
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Christopher S. Coleman
PERKINS & COIE
contact info
Tamara Hackmann
FINLEY & ALT
contact info
Erin Murphy
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Mary Z. Gaston
PERKINS & COIE
contact info
Kevin J. Driscoll
FINLEY LAW FIRM
contact info
C. Harker Rhodes IV
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Tyson Foods Inc
Represented By
Paul D. Clement
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Christopher S. Coleman
PERKINS & COIE
contact info
Tamara Hackmann
FINLEY & ALT
contact info
Erin Murphy
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Mary Z. Gaston
PERKINS & COIE
contact info
Kevin J. Driscoll
FINLEY LAW FIRM
contact info
C. Harker Rhodes IV
KIRKLAND & ELLIS
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Oscar Fernandez, individually, and as administrator of the estate of Isidro Fernandez
Represented By
Scott Lawrence Nelson
PUBLIC CITIZEN LITIGATION GROUP
contact info
Thomas P. Frerichs
FRERICHS LAW OFFICE
contact info
John Jay Rausch
RAUSCH LAW FIRM
contact info
Adam R. Pulver
PUBLIC CITIZEN LITIGATION GROUP
contact info
Gabriel Phillips
SPENCE LAW FIRM
contact info
George Bryan Ulmer III
SPENCE LAW FIRM
contact info
Mel C. Orchard III
SPENCE LAW FIRM
contact info

GPO Dec 30 2022
OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Jane Kelly, Ralph R. Erickson and L. Steven Grasz
AUTHORING JUDGE:Jane Kelly (PUBLISHED) [5112618] [21-1010, 21-1012]

Docket last updated: 12/31/2021 2:29 AM CST
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
5 pgs Civil case docketed. [4990944] 21-1012 (CMH)
Related: [-]
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Order dated 12/28/2020. [4990954] 21-1012 (CMH)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Appendix due on 02/16/2021. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Dean Banks, Tom Brower, Cody Brustkern, John Casey, Tom Hart, Stephen R. Stouffer, Bret Tapken, John H. Tyson, Tyson Foods Inc, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. and Noel W. White due 02/16/2021.
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[4990964] 21-1012 (CMH)
Related: [-]