Steven Rodriguez v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-08697 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 22, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 06, 2020 |
Case in other court: | California Northern, 4:20-cv-03260 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 21, 2021 1:38 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 06, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 10/07 8:29 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby APPROVES the Stipulation30 . Accordingly, and pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, all claims and counterclaims in this action are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, each side responsible for its own costs, expenses and attorney's fees. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 10/05 2:34 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Without Prejudice - FRCP 41 filed by PLAINTIFF Steven Rodriguez.(Goldsmith, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Dismissing Action Without Prejudice | ||
29 | 29
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Mon 10/05 2:22 PM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (esa) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 10/05 2:20 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (esa) |
|
26 | 26
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Mon 10/05 2:11 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Northern |
|
Tuesday, September 22, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Mon 10/05 2:19 PM
Copy of Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 8/5/20 regarding transfer of Case No. 4:20-cv-03260-YGR from California Northern-Oakland. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-2814 AB (PVCx). (esa) |
|
25 | 25 TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to the Central District of California. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Thursday, August 20, 2020 | ||
24 | 24 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE MONDAY, 8/24/2020 AT 2:00PM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Tuesday, August 04, 2020 | ||
23 | 23 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
22 | 22 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ZOOM. Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 8/24/2020 02:00 PM by Zoom. (fs, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Standing Order | ||
Wednesday, June 17, 2020 | ||
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Motion did not include a proposed order. Please file a proposed order using the proposed order event. Re:20 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hear ing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Ford Motor Company (jjbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | ||
Tuesday, June 16, 2020 | ||
21 | 21 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING.THE MOTION TO REMAND [DKT. NO. 16] SET FOR TUESDAY, 6/23/2020 AT 2:00 PM IS VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
20 | 20 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Ford Motor Company. (Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Tuesday, June 09, 2020 | ||
19 | 19 REPLY filed bySteven Rodriguez.(Goldsmith, David) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Supplement EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND MOTION TO STRIKE, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE | ||
Friday, June 05, 2020 | ||
18 | 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byFord Motor Company.(Maclear, Amy) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Amy Maclear, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Notice of Lodging, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 9 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
17 | 17 ORDER DENYING 14 EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Thursday, June 04, 2020 | ||
16 | 16 Amended MOTION to Remand filed by Steven Rodriguez. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 6/2/2020. Replies due by 6/9/2020.(Goldsmith, David) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration DECLARATION OF DAVID A. GOLDSMITH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND ACTION, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 29, 2020 | ||
15 | 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed bySteven Rodriguez. (Goldsmith, David) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
14 | 14 Ex Parte Application to Stay All Proceedings and Deadlines Pending JPML Determination of Inclusion in MDL No. 2814 filed by Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Amy Maclear, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 8 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, May 21, 2020 | ||
13 | 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/21/2020.(mbcS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Wednesday, May 20, 2020 | ||
12 | 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Tuesday, May 19, 2020 | ||
11 | 11 MOTION to Remand filed by Steven Rodriguez. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 6/5/2020. Replies due by 6/12/2020.(Goldsmith, David) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Supporting Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Steven Rodriguez identifying Corporate Parent Ford Motor Company for Steven Rodriguez. (Goldsmith, David) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
9 | 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Steven Rodriguez.. (Goldsmith, David) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David Allan Goldsmith (Goldsmith, David) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Thursday, May 14, 2020 | ||
7 | 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Wednesday, May 13, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Patricia Maclear, Esq(Maclear, Amy) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
4 | 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/27/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
2 | 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. for Ford Motor Company. (Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is HG20055449. (). Filed byFord Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/5/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Amy Maclear, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 14 Certificate/Proof of Service |