Turtle Island Foods v. Strain
Louisiana Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Brian A Jackson |
Referred: | Erin Wilder-Doomes |
Case #: | 3:20-cv-00674 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 07, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 22, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 05, 2021 3:46 AM CDT |
Defendant
Michael G. Strain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Turtle Island Foods SPC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, December 22, 2023 | ||
71 | 71
order
Notice to Counsel - General Order 2019-04
Fri 12/22 11:21 AM
GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (JEG) |
|
70 | 70
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment
Fri 12/22 11:20 AM
CONSENT JUDGMENT granting69 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. The above-captioned action be and is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/22/2023. (JEG) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
69 | 69
motion
Approve Consent Judgment
Thu 12/21 2:33 PM
MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Turtle Island Foods SPC(Sternberg, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; Consent Judgment |