Designworks Homes, Inc., et al v. Columbia Hse of Brokers Realty, et al
Original Case: 2:18-cv-04090
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-03104 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Case Filed: | Oct 08, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 17, 2021 3:26 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Columbia House of Brokers Realty, Inc., doing business as House of Brokers, Inc., doing business as Jackie Bulgin & Associates
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Shannon L. O'Brien
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Nicole Waldschlager
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Deborah Ann Fisher
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe I
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jacqueline Bulgin, doing business as Jackie Bulgin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Carol S. Denninghoff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Designworks Homes, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Charles Lawrence James
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 16 2021
OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Raymond W. Gruender, Morris S. Arnold and David R. Stras AUTHORING JUDGE:Morris S. Arnold (PUBLISHED) [5065698] [19-3608, 20-1099, 20-3104, 20-3107] |
Docket last updated: 08/17/2021 3:26 AM CDT |
Thursday, October 08, 2020 | ||
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [4964048] 20-3104 (AEV) | ||
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order 9/28/20, docket entries, [4964053] 20-3104 (AEV) | ||
2
pgs
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 11/17/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Designworks Homes, Inc. and Charles Lawrence James due 11/17/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4964056] 20-3104 (AEV) |