Andrew Parker et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:20-cv-09079 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 02, 2020 |
Case in other court: | California Southern, 3:20-cv-01023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 31, 2021 2:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
DOES 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jasmine Leese
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Parker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago |
Friday, April 23, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 04/23 5:26 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Friday, January 29, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 01/29 5:07 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan Carlo Cagliata counsel for Plaintiffs Jasmine Leese, Andrew Parker. Jonathan C. Cagliata is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Andrew Parker and Jasmine Leese. (Cagliata, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, October 13, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Tue 10/13 10:38 AM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (car) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 10/13 10:35 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car) |
|
23 | 23
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Tue 10/13 9:53 AM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern |
|
Friday, October 02, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Tue 10/13 10:32 AM
Copy of Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 9/30/2020 regarding transfer of Case No. 3:20-cv-01023-BAS-MDD from U.S. District Court Southern District of California (San Diego). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-2814-AB-FFMx. (car) |
|
22 | 22 Case transferred to District of Central District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California*.*350 W. First St.**Los Angeles, CA 90012* (jdt) (dlg). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
Att: 1 MDL 2814 Transfer Order dtd 10.2.2020 | ||
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
21 | 21 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Stay (ECF No.18 ). Case stayed. All proceedings in this matter are STAYED pending the decision of the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation as to whether to include this case in the MDL. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/28/20. (jmo) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
Monday, July 27, 2020 | ||
20 | 20 ORDER granting in part and denying in part17 Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation/Case Management Conference. The Court finds good cause to vacate the ENE/CMC pending a ruling on the Motion to Stay or if the case is ordered transferred. If the Motion to Stay is denied the parties must contact the Court within five (5) days to reschedule the ENE/CMC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 07/27/2020. (no document attached) (atk) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
19 | 19 DECLARATION re17 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by Plaintiffs Jasmine Leese, Andrew Parker. (Cagliata, Jonathan) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
18 | 18 Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings and Deadlines Pending JPML Determination of Inclusion in MDL 2814 by Ford Motor Company. (Brown, Arielle) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
17 | 17 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by Jasmine Leese, Andrew Parker. (Cagliata, Jonathan) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ford Motor Company re15 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings and Deadlines Pending JPML Determination of Inclusion in MDL 2814 filed by Ford Motor Company . (Brown, Arielle) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
Thursday, July 23, 2020 | ||
15 | 15 **WITHDRAWN BY FILER PER NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL15 ** MOTION to Stay All Proceedings and Deadlines Pending JPML Determination of Inclusion in MDL 2814 by Ford Motor Company.(Brown, Arielle)**QC mailer sent re improper motion (no hrg date). Instructed to withdraw and refile per chambers.(jmo) Modified on 7/27/2020 to withdraw document and term motion (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Arielle E. Brown, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-Joint Stipulation, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B-JPML Order, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C-List of Cases in MDL 2814, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D-CTO 51, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E-Opp to CTO 51, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F-Briefing Schedule, | ||
Att: 9 Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Arielle E. Brown on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Brown, Arielle)Attorney Arielle E. Brown added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
Thursday, July 02, 2020 | ||
13 | 13 NOTICE of Teleconference Information Sheet. Teleconference set for 08/04/2020 at 9:30AM. (atk) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
12 | 12 NOTICE AND ORDER for Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference/Case Management Conference. Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/4/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Joint Discovery Plan due 7/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 7/2/20.(jmo) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
Tuesday, June 16, 2020 | ||
11 | 11 NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Ford Motor Company re1 Notice of Removal, Exhibits B, C, D, E, H, I, J, L, M(Hugret, Spencer) *QC Mailer re: improper caption (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit M | ||
Thursday, June 04, 2020 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Ford Motor Company of case(s) 2814-AB Notice of Related Cases .(Rogerson, Hailey) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proof of Service 2020-06-04 Certificate of Service | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Hailey Rogerson by Hailey Marie Rogerson on behalf of Ford Motor Company(Rogerson, Hailey)Attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proof of Service 2020-06-04 Certificate of Service | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMY MACLEAR by Amy Maclear on behalf of Ford Motor Company(Maclear, Amy)Attorney Amy Maclear added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proof of Service 2020-06-04 Certificate of Service | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Spencer P. Hugret by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Ford Motor Company(Hugret, Spencer) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Proof of Service 2020-06-04 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, June 03, 2020 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Carlo Cagliata on behalf of Jasmine Leese, Andrew Parker (Cagliata, Jonathan)Attorney Jonathan Carlo Cagliata added to party Jasmine Leese (pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Carlo Cagliata added to party Andrew Parker(pty:pla) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sepehr Daghighian on behalf of Jasmine Leese, Andrew Parker (Daghighian, Sepehr)Attorney Sepehr Daghighian added to party Jasmine Leese (pty:pla), Attorney Sepehr Daghighian added to party Andrew Parker(pty:pla) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Harris Rosenstein on behalf of Jasmine Leese, Andrew Parker (Rosenstein, Michael) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
3 | 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (vxc) (dsn) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ford Motor Company. Identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. for Ford Motor Company. (vxc) (dsn) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2019 0005423-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13958670.), filed by Ford Motor Company. The new case number is 3:20-cv-1023-BAS-MDD. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(vxc) (dsn) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 State Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration fo Spencer P. Hugret, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit |