NSC Liquidating Trust v. Panties Plus Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12394
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12394
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50863 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 27, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Panties Plus Inc.
320 Fifth Avenue 2nd Floor Attn: Abe Hanan
New York, NY 10001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NSC Liquidating Trust
300 Delaware Ave, Ste 1015
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 01/27 8:52 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50863 Closed (DMC) |
||
Tuesday, January 26, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Dismissal as to Panties Plus Inc. Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Service regarding Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER Order Signed on 1/19/2021. (CAS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, January 14, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Transcript regarding Hearing Held 1/5/21 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 4/7/2021. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at Telephone number 302-654-8080. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 1/14/2021. Redaction Request Due By 1/28/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 2/8/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 4/7/2021. (Murin, Leslie) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Certificate of Service regarding Amended Summons, Complaint, and Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Panties Plus Inc.. Correcting Plaintiff Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/5/2021. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Panties Plus Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/1/2021. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 30, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Supplement Notice of Filing of Initial Preference Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 10/14 5:35 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50863 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10003029, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50863 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers of Property Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 by NSC Liquidating Trust against Panties Plus Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 1/12/2021. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |