NSC Liquidating Trust v. My Import USA LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12394
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12394
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50890 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 25, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
My Import USA LLC
115 Enterprise Avenue South Attn: Fahim Ibrahimi
Secaucus, NJ 07094 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NSC Liquidating Trust
300 Delaware Ave, Ste 1015
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 10, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Amended Certificate of Service Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Monday, April 19, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Status Report as of April 19, 2021 Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Thursday, March 25, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 03/25 8:35 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50890 Closed (Murin, Leslie) |
||
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 03/12/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 11, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 03/11/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 10, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Default Judgment against Defendant My Import USA LLC. Signed on 3/10/2021. (MD) |
|
Tuesday, March 09, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant My Import USA LLC Signed on 3/9/2021. (DMC) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
14 | 14
![]() Request for Entry of Default Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Monday, March 08, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Status Report in Connection with Certain Preference Adversary Proceedings Pending Before the Honorable Christopher Sontchi Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Thursday, February 25, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Service of Discovery (New Address) Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Service regarding Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER Order Signed on 1/19/2021. (CAS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, January 15, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust, NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service regarding Amended Summons, Complaint, and Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant My Import USA LLC. Correcting Pretrial Conference date and Plaintiff Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/5/2021. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Friday, December 04, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant My Import USA LLC. (Correcting Pretrial Conference date) Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/2/2021. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant My Import USA LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/1/2021. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 30, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Supplement Notice of Filing of Initial Preference Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 10/14 5:39 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50890 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10003071, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50890 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers of Property Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 by NSC Liquidating Trust against My Import USA LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 1/12/2021. (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |