NSC Liquidating Trust v. Sunteck Transportation, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12394
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12394
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50893 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Sunteck Transportation, Inc.
PO Box 253
Cresco, PA 18326 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NSC Liquidating Trust
300 Delaware Ave, Ste 1015
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Monday, April 19, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Status Report as of April 19, 2021 Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Wednesday, March 17, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust (Cohen, Howard) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/17 3:10 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50893 Closed (Murin, Leslie) |
||
Monday, March 08, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Status Report in Connection with Certain Preference Adversary Proceedings Pending Before the Honorable Christopher Sontchi Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Certificate of Service regarding Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER Order Signed on 1/19/2021. (CAS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, January 15, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust, NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Alias Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Sunteck Transport Co., LLC.. Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/22/2021. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() Amended Complaint to Modify Party Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust AP Summons Served due date: 3/23/2020. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Certificate of Service regarding Amended Summons, Complaint, and Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Sunteck Transportation, Inc.. Correcting Plaintiff Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/5/2021. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Sunteck Transportation, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/1/2021. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 30, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Supplement Notice of Filing of Initial Preference Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 10/14 5:35 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50893 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10003029, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50893 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers of Property Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 by NSC Liquidating Trust against Sunteck Transportation, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 1/12/2021. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |