NSC Liquidating Trust v. Tirosh International Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12394
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12394
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50902 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Tirosh International Inc.
200 East 2nd Street, Suite 35 Attn: David Khalili
Huntington Station, NY 11746 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NSC Liquidating Trust
300 Delaware Ave, Ste 1015
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 26, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 01/26 10:13 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50902 Closed (DMC) |
||
Monday, January 25, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Dismissal as to Tirosh International Inc. Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Service regarding Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Scheduling Order The case judge is Christopher S. Sontchi. Pre-Trial Order due by 5/19/2021. Discovery due by 4/29/2021. Signed on 1/19/2021. (DRG) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER Order Signed on 1/19/2021. (CAS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, January 15, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust, NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Certificate of Service regarding Amended Summons, Complaint, and Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Tirosh International Inc.. Correcting Plaintiff Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/5/2021. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Tirosh International Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/1/2021. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 30, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Supplement Notice of Filing of Initial Preference Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 10/14 5:35 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50902 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10003029, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50902 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers of Property Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 by NSC Liquidating Trust against Tirosh International Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 1/12/2021. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |