NSC LIQUIDATING TRUST v. LIBERTY COCA-COLA BEVERAGES LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12394
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-12394
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50906 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 25, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
LIBERTY COCA-COLA BEVERAGES LLC
PO Box 780810 Attn: Tom McBrady
Philadelphia, PA 19178 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NSC Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 08, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust (Songonuga, Natasha) |
|
Monday, April 19, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Status Report as of April 19, 2021 Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Thursday, March 25, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 03/25 12:34 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50906 Closed (DMC) |
||
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 03/12/2021. (Admin.) |
|
18 | 18
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 03/12/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 10, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Default Judgment against Defendant Liberty Coca-Cola Beverages LLC. Signed on 3/10/2021. (FMo) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendant Liberty Coca-Cola Beverages LLC Signed on 3/10/2021. (FMo) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
14 | 14
![]() Request for Entry of Default Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Monday, March 08, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Status Report in Connection with Certain Preference Adversary Proceedings Pending Before the Honorable Christopher Sontchi Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Service of Discovery Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures and Plaintiff's 1st Set of Discovery Requests Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Certificate of Service regarding Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER Order Signed on 1/19/2021. (CAS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, January 15, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust, NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Certificate of Service regarding Amended Summons, Complaint, and Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant LIBERTY COCA-COLA BEVERAGES LLC. Correcting Plaintiff Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/5/2021. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant LIBERTY COCA-COLA BEVERAGES LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/1/2021. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 30, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Supplement Notice of Filing of Initial Preference Scheduling Order Filed by NSC Liquidating Trust. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 10/14 5:35 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50906 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10003029, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50906 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers of Property Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 by NSC LIQUIDATING TRUST against LIBERTY COCA-COLA BEVERAGES LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 1/12/2021. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |