Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-50133

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:20-ap-05034
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2020
Terminated:Jan 12, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Southern Tier Hemp LLC
333 W WASHINGTON ST Suite 600
Syracuse, NY 13202
Represented By
Southern Tier Hemp LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
OGGUSA, Inc.
4274 Colby Road
Winchester, KY 40391
Represented By
James R. Irving
Dentons Bingham Greenebaum LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
OGG, Inc.
321 Venable Road, Suite 2
Winchester, KY 40391
Represented By
James R. Irving
Dentons Bingham Greenebaum LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GenCanna Acquisition Corp.
4274 Colby Road
Winchester, KY 40391
Represented By
James R. Irving
Dentons Bingham Greenebaum LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 16 2021
Memorandum Opinion and Order (RE: related document(s)10 Motion To Determine Claims As Non-Core filed by Defendant Southern Tier Hemp LLC, 11 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Complaint under F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) AND F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) or, in the alternative, for permissive abstention of this action, or, in the alternative, to transfer all counts relating to the Nanticoke Notes to the USDC, for the Northern District of NY filed by Defendant Southern Tier Hemp LLC, 16 Motion to Stay Proceeding filed by Defendant Southern Tier Hemp LLC). (bjp)

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
court Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 01/12 12:28 PM
Adversary Proceeding 20-5034 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]