Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barbara J Houser
Case #: 3:14-bk-32605
Case Filed:May 30, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Jul 08, 2014
Claims Deadline:Oct 06, 2014
Dismissed:Mar 30, 2015
Terminated:Apr 21, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Craft International LLC
3824 Cedar Springs Rd # 357
Dallas, TX 75219-4136
Represented By
Seymour Roberts, Jr.
Neligan Foley LLP
contact info
Patrick J. Neligan, Jr.
Neligan Foley LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242

Docket last updated: 03/31/2015 7:00 PM CDT
Friday, May 30, 2014
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 14-32605 11) [misc,volp11a] (1213.00). Receipt number 19110365, amount $1213.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#
1 1 6 pgs Chapter 11 voluntary petition. Fee Amount $1213 Filed by Craft International LLC (Roberts, Seymour) (6 pgs)
Related: [-]
2 2 20 Largest unsecured creditors . Filed by Debtor Craft International LLC. (Roberts, Seymour) (3 pgs)
Related: [-]
3 3 Creditor matrix . Filed by Debtor Craft International LLC. (Roberts, Seymour) (8 pgs)
Related: [-]
4 4 Schedules A, B, D-H. Filed by Debtor Craft International LLC. (Roberts, Seymour) (22 pgs)
Related: [-]
5 5 Statement of financial affairs . Filed by Debtor Craft International LLC. (Roberts, Seymour) (9 pgs)
Related: [-]