Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:14-bk-32605

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barbara J Houser
Case #: 3:14-ap-03115
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2014
Terminated:Oct 15, 2015

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



1. American Sniper?s Widow Sues Bankrupt Training Company He Founded (blogs.wsj.com)
Submitted Mon 09/15/2014
Docket last updated: 04/24/2018 1:07 PM CDT
Wednesday, August 27, 2014
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 14-03115 bjh) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 19534657, amount $ 350.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#
1 1 Adversary case 14-03115 Complaint by Taya Kyle against Craft International LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 72 (Injunctive relief - other). 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). (Pronske, Gerrit) (7 pgs; 2 docs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet