Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:20-bk-30108

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Eduardo V Rodriguez
Case #: 4:20-ap-03448
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2020
Terminated:Aug 17, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Roger D. Crooks, Defendant
620 N. Houston Avenue
Humble, TX 77056
Represented By
Roger D. Crooks
contact info
Defendant
Ecocast Homes, LLC, Defendant
5100 Westheimer, Suite 115
Houston, TX 77056
Represented By
Ecocast Homes, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jean Crooks, Defendant
620 N. Houston Avenue
Humble, TX 77056
Represented By
Jean Crooks
contact info
Defendant
Kay Russell, Defendant
620 N. Houston Avenue
Humble, TX 77338
Represented By
Kay Russell
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald J Sommers, Plaintiff
Nathan Sommers Jacobs 2800 Post Oak Blvd Suite 6100
Houston, TX 77056
Represented By
Kell Corrigan Mercer
Kell C. Mercer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Thursday, October 13, 2022
26 26 notice Notice Thu 10/13 10:49 AM
Notice of Satisfaction and Release of Judgment As To Jean Crooks Only . Related [+] Filed by Ronald J Sommers (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-] 23 Judgment
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 09/06 1:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Susan Tran Adams Filed by on behalf of Jean Crooks (Tran Adams, Susan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/17 2:52 PM
Adversary Case 4:20-ap-3448 Closed. (jchavez)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 16, 2021
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/17 3:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 07/16/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Judgment
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
23 23 2 pgs order Judgment Wed 07/14 2:52 PM
Final Judgment Against Defendants Roger D. Crooks, Ecocast Homes, LLC, Jean Crooks, and Kay Russell. Signed on 7/14/2021 (jchavez)
Related: [-]
22 22 court Courtroom Minutes Wed 07/14 2:37 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 1:30 p.m.. Appearances: Kell Mercer and Russ Horton for the Plaintiff. Minutes: Opening general statements by Mr. Mercer regarding 20-3448 20-3502 20-3503 and 20-3504 Plaintiff's Exhibits 1-7 were admitted. Arguments heard. Mr. Mercer was questioned regarding service. Default Judgment granted as stated on the record.. Related [+]. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment
Friday, July 09, 2021
21 21 72 pgs misc Exhibit List Fri 07/09 12:51 PM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By Ronald J Sommers ) Related [+] (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment
Saturday, June 19, 2021
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/19 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 06/19/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order Setting Hearing
Friday, June 18, 2021
19 19 misc Certificate Fri 06/18 5:07 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order Setting Hearing (Filed By Ronald J Sommers ) Related [+] (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-] 18 Order Setting Hearing
Thursday, June 17, 2021
18 18 order Setting Hearing Thu 06/17 10:52 AM
Order Canceling Status Conference and Setting Electronic Hearing. Signed on 6/17/2021 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2021 at 01:30 PM via telephone and video conference. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 14 Order Setting Hearing,17 Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
17 17 motion Default Judgment Wed 06/16 3:56 PM
Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Ronald J Sommers (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kell C. Mercer
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1 Military Service Affidavits
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 27, 2021
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/27 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 05/27/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order Setting Hearing
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
15 15 misc Certificate Wed 05/26 1:17 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order Setting Electronic Status Conference (Filed By Ronald J Sommers ) Related [+] (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-] 14 Order Setting Hearing
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
14 14 order Setting Hearing Tue 05/25 3:33 PM
Order Setting Electronic Status Conference. Signed on 5/25/2021 Status conference to be held on 6/29/2021 at 09:00 AM via telephone and video conference. (jchavez)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
13 13 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 03/26 1:36 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Kay Russell Related [+]. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Motion
12 12 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 03/26 1:35 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Ecocast Homes, LLC. Related [+]. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Motion
11 11 1 pgs court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 03/26 1:34 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Jean Crooks. Related [+]. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Motion
10 10 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 03/26 1:32 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Roger D. Crooks Related [+]. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Motion
Thursday, March 25, 2021
9 9 motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Thu 03/25 12:16 PM
Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk Filed by Ronald J Sommers (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Military Service Status Reports
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default for Roger D. Crooks
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default for Jean Crooks
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default for Ecocast Homes, LLC
Att: 5 Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default for Kay Russell
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/27 7:17 AM
Summons Service Executed on Ecocast Homes, LLC 10/26/2020. (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/27 7:16 AM
Summons Service Executed on Kay Russell 10/26/2020. (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/27 7:15 AM
Summons Service Executed on Jean Crooks 10/26/2020. (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/27 7:15 AM
Summons Service Executed on Roger D. Crooks 10/26/2020. (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 26, 2020
4 4 2 pgs court Summons Issued Mon 10/26 10:14 AM
Summons Issued on Jean Crooks ; Roger D. Crooks ; Ecocast Homes, LLC ; and Kay Russell, Date Issued 10/26/2020. (DawnWaggoner)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice Mon 10/26 7:22 AM
Notice of Appearance of Counsel for the Plaintiff . Related [+] Filed by Ronald J Sommers (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Sunday, October 25, 2020
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Sun 10/25 4:37 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Roger D. Crooks, Jean Crooks, Kay Russell, and Ecocast Homes, LLC. (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 24, 2020
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint [system event] Sat 10/24 9:11 AM
Adversary case 20-03448 Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers, for Damages, and For Other Relief by Ronald J Sommers against Roger D. Crooks, Ecocast Homes, LLC, Jean Crooks, Kay Russell. Fee Amount $350 (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 2018 Transfers
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 2019 Transfers