Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Eduardo V Rodriguez
Case #: 4:20-bk-30108
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2020
Terminated:May 17, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Ecocast Investments, Inc
620 N Houston Ave
Humble, TX 77338-3873
Represented By
Arne M Ray
Ray & Associates
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 01/05/2020 6:00 PM CST
Monday, January 06, 2020
crditcrd none Mon 01/06 4:31 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-30108 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21769320. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Mon 01/06 4:24 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Ecocast Investments, Inc. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 07/6/2020. (Ray, Arne)
Related: [-]