Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-11802

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 1:20-ap-01313
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Nov 05, 2020
Terminated:Sep 25, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Reed Smith LLP
Represented By
Nancy Elizabeth Hart
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Kevin S. Rosen
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
David Michael Feldman
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Defendant
James C. McCarroll
Represented By
James C. McCarroll
contact info
Defendant
Geoffrey Varga
Represented By
Christopher M. Paparella
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Julie Christine Amadeo
Steptoe & Johnson, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Jeffrey Mark Reisner
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Defendant
James L. Sanders
Represented By
James L. Sanders
contact info
Defendant
Francisca Mok
Represented By
Francisca Mok
contact info
Defendant
Kurt Gwynne
Represented By
Kurt Gwynne
contact info
Defendant
Jordan W. Siev
Represented By
Jordan W. Siev
contact info
Defendant
David Bree
Represented By
Douglas Hirsch
Sadis & Goldberg
contact info
Jennifer Amy Rossan
Sadis & Goldberg
contact info
Defendant
David M. Seymour
Represented By
Katherine R. Catanese
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Roger Hanson
Represented By
Katherine R. Catanese
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jess Shakespeare
Represented By
Christopher M. Paparella
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Julie Christine Amadeo
Steptoe & Johnson, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Jeffrey Mark Reisner
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kinetic Partners
Represented By
Christopher M. Paparella
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Julie Christine Amadeo
Steptoe & Johnson, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Jeffrey Mark Reisner
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Duff & Phelps, LLC
Represented By
Christopher M. Paparella
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Julie Christine Amadeo
Steptoe & Johnson, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Jeffrey Mark Reisner
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
contact info
Defendant
DMS Governance LTD
Represented By
Katherine R. Catanese
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
David Molner
Represented By
David Molner
contact info

GPO Apr 30 2021
Opinion and Order Signed on 4/30/2021 Denying Motion for Remand Based on Mandatory or Permissive Abstention. (related document(s)6) (Calderon, Lynda)
GPO Sep 04 2024
Decision and Order Signed on 9/4/2024 Granting Motions to Dismiss. (related document(s)73, 79, 77) (Calderon, Lynda)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 09/25 9:34 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1313 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]