G. S., et al v. Penn Trafford School District, et al
Original Case: 2:18-cv-00204
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-03281 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 09, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 13, 2023 4:32 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
PENN TRAFFORD SCHOOL DISTRICT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GREGORY CAPOCCIONI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ANTHONY AQUILIO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MATTHEW HARRIS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
SCOTT INGLESE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
G. S., as an individual and mother and natural giardian of SS.,a minor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
S.S., a minor
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 12 2023
NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: MCKEE*, RESTREPO and ROTH, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 12. Judge: MCKEE Authoring. *Judge McKee assumed senior status on October 21, 2022. |
Docket last updated: 07/13/2023 4:32 AM EDT |
Monday, November 09, 2020 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (DW) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants G. S. and S.S. in District Court No. 2-18-cv-00204. (DW) | ||
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice of Appeal | ||
Att: 2 12 pgs District_Court_Opinion_101920 | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs District_Court_Judgment Order_101920 | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs District_Court_Order_101920 | ||
Att: 5 1 pgs Case-Caption | ||
Att: 6 3 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
1 pgs ORDER (Clerk) Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 113.12 and the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Cases, personal identifier information must be redacted from filings. These identifiers include Social Security numbers, names of minor children, financial account numbers, dates of birth, and home addresses in criminal cases. Litigants are responsible for redacting documents. This Court's Local Appellate Rules and a link to the Judicial Conference Policy are available at www.ca3.uscourts.gov. The District Court identified the minor child, S.S., and S.S.'s mother by their initials only. Accordingly, this action has been docketed under the initials of the minor child, S.S., and S.S.'s mother, rather than their full names. Counsel should comply with L.A.R. 113.12 and the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy. Any future filings should be in compliance with the local rule and that policy. The Clerk will not review each filing for compliance with L.A.R. 113.12. This order has no impact on any filings in the District Court, and counsel should address any issues regarding those filings with that Court. (DW) |