Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:20-ap-03147
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2020
Terminated:May 13, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
ConvergeOne, Inc.
10900 Nesbitt Ave S
Bloomington, MN 55437
Represented By
ConvergeOne, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Brittany Jane Nelson
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, May 13, 2021
5 5 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 05/13 1:51 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 02/23 1:56 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Foley & Lardner LLP on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/23 1:01 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Foley & Lardner LLP on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee,2 Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY
Friday, November 20, 2020
2 2 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Fri 11/20 2:24 PM
Summons and notice issued to ConvergeOne, Inc. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Thursday, November 19, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 11/19 4:39 PM
Adversary case 20-03147 Complaint against ConvergeOne, Inc. (Fee Amount of $350 is Deferred) filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]