Seadrill Operating GP LLC Jointly Administered under 20-35740.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-35740
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-35740
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:20-bk-35760 |
Case Filed: | Dec 01, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jun 08, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Seadrill Operating GP LLC
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Generic Order
Mon 04/29 4:43 PM
Agreed Order Regarding Hearing, Signed on 4/29/2024 (SierraThomasAnderson) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Proposed Order
Thu 04/25 8:58 AM
Proposed Order RE: Agreed Order Regarding Hearing (Filed By US Trustee ). (Garza, Vianey) |
|
Saturday, March 30, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 03/30 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/30/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Generic Order
Thu 03/28 8:15 AM
COPY OF Order Reopening Seadrill Operating GP LLC Case and Final Decree Closing Seadrill Partners, LLC Case in Main Case no. 20-35740 at ECF no. 890, Signed on 3/28/2024 (SierraThomasAnderson) |
|
utility
Reopen Bankruptcy Case
Thu 03/28 8:16 AM
Bankruptcy Case Reopened. (SierraThomasAnderson) |
||
court
Case Reassigned
Thu 03/28 8:26 AM
Judge Marvin Isgur added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated (tjl4) |
||
utility
Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY)
Thu 03/28 10:08 AM
Appearances: Aaron McCardell for the Debtor. Debtor present, sworn in, testimony given. Schedules i and j, plus a statement regarding status of food stamps to be filed no later than 04/11/24. Motion to extend the stay is conditionally approved; order to be entered to that effect. (SierraThomasAnderson) |
||
Thursday, June 24, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 06/24 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/24/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 08, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
order
Final Decree (No Form)
Mon 06/21 8:08 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases Signed on 6/8/2021 (emiller) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 01/21 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/21/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, January 16, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists
Sat 01/16 6:00 AM
|
|
Friday, December 04, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
order
Joint Administration
Fri 12/04 9:12 AM
Order for Joint Administration under 20-35740 Signed on 12/4/2020 (aaloadi) |
|
utility
Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY)
Fri 12/04 9:13 AM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 20-35740 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aaloadi) |
||
court
Case Reassigned
Fri 01/15 7:46 AM
Judge David R Jones added to case. Involvement of Judge Marvin Isgur Terminated. (ltie) |
||
Wednesday, December 02, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
court
No Creditor Mailing List
Wed 12/02 11:39 AM
No Creditor Mailing List (JacquelineMataadi) |
|
crditcrd
none
Wed 12/02 10:21 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-35760 [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22638541. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
18
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Tue 12/01 1:58 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Seadrill Operating GP LLC. (Polnick, Veronica) |