Velez v. Cuomo et al
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Gary L Sharpe |
Referred: | Daniel J Stewart |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-01584 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2020 |
Re-opened: | Jan 20, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Florida Middle, 8:20-cv-02871 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 19, 2021 5:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
Bill de Blasio
|
|
Defendant
Andrew Cuomo
|
|
Defendant
Tony Evers
|
|
Defendant
Governor Jay Inslee
|
|
Defendant
Gavin Newsom
|
|
Defendant
Gretchen Whitmore
|
|
Defendant
Governor Tom Wolf
|
|
Plaintiff
Bianca Velez
Mommy's Me Time 2915 Vermont Ave
Lakeland, FL 33803 |
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 11, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 05/11 1:58 PM
MANDATE of USCA: UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED . (egr) |
|
Wednesday, May 26, 2021 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 05/26 3:44 PM
USCA Case Number 21-1195 for22 Notice of Appeal filed by Bianca Velez. (nas, ) |
||
Thursday, May 20, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
appeal
Supplemental Electronic Certification Sent to USCA
Thu 05/20 12:11 PM
Supplemental Electronic Certification transmitted to US Court of Appeals re22 Notice of Appeal. {Copy mailed to pltf on 5/20/2021) (see) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 05/20 12:02 PM
USCA ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE filed by Bianca Velez. (see) |
|
Tuesday, May 04, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
appeal
Electronic Notice and Certification to USCA of Appeal
Tue 05/04 4:17 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE AND CERTIFICATION sent to US Court of Appeals, re:22 Notice of Appeal. (see) |
|
22 | 22
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 05/04 4:09 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to19 Order Dismissing Case and20 Judgment by Bianca Velez. (see) |
|
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Return Receipt
Mon 04/26 8:16 PM
U.S. POSTAL RETURN RECEIPT received from Bianca Velez, re: certified return receipt service of the19 Order Dismissing Case and20 Judgment. (see) |
|
Monday, April 19, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment
Mon 04/19 3:13 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Andrew Cuomo, Bill de Blasio, Gavin Newsom, Gretchen Whitmore, Jay Inslee, Tom Wolf, Tony Evers against Bianca Velez. (Copy served via regular and certified mail) (jel, ) |
|
19 | 19
3
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 04/19 3:12 PM
ORDER - That the Report-Recommendation and Order (Dkt. No. 17) is ADOPTED in its entirety. That the amended complaint (Dkt. No. 16) is DISMISSED . That Velez's motion for leave to amend (Dkt. No. 18) is DENIED . Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 4/19/2021. (Copy served via regular and certified)(jel, ) |
|
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 03/23 11:43 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bill de Blasio, Andrew Cuomo, Tony Evers, Jay Inslee, Gavin Newsom, Gretchen Whitmore, Tom Wolf filed by Bianca Velez.(see) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-F, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Friday, March 19, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 03/19 10:02 AM
REPORT-RECOMMENDATION and ORDER re16 Amended Complaint filed by Bianca Velez. RECOMMENDED that pltf's Amended Complaint be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 4/2/2021 Case Review Deadline 4/5/2021 Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/19/2021. (Copy served upon Bianca Velez via regular mail on 3/19/2021)(see) |
|
Tuesday, March 02, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 03/03 8:15 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bianca Velez.(see) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Mon 03/01 12:39 PM
ORDER - That the14 Report-Recommendation and Order is ADOPTED in its entirety. That plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. No. 1) is DISMISSED . That plaintiff may, within thirty (30) days of the date of the Order, file an amended complaint, which is consistent with the Report-Recommendation and Order. That, if plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint in the time allotted, the Clerk shall enter judgment dismissing the case without further order of the court. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 3/1/2021. (Copy served via regular mail upon plaintiff)(jel, ) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 03/01 12:43 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Notice of Compliance Deadline 3/31/2021. Case Review Deadline 4/5/2021. (jel, ) |
||
Tuesday, February 09, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 02/09 1:13 PM
REPORT-RECOMMENDATION & ORDER re1 Complaint filed by Bianca Velez: RECOMMENDED, that Plaintiffs Complaint be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 2/23/2021 Case Review Deadline 2/26/2021 Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/9/2021. (Copy served via regular mail along with the Order on IFP on 2/9/2021)(see) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 02/09 1:09 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/9/2021. (see) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Reopening Case (Text-Only Inmate)
Wed 01/20 3:37 PM
TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. So Ordered by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 1/20/2021. (Copy served upon Bianca Velez via regular mail on 1/20/2021)(see) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 01/20 3:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Bianca Velez. Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (see) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order Directing Administrative Closure
Thu 01/07 1:22 PM
ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 1/7/2021. (Copy served via regular mail)(jel, ) |
|
Monday, December 21, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 12/21 12:20 PM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:20-cv-02871. electronically transferred when case opened |
|
Wednesday, December 16, 2020 | ||
8 | 8 ORDERED: This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York, for all further proceedings, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a). The Clerk is directed to transfer this action immediately to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York, Albany Division, and close this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 12/16/2020. (CSS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/21/2020.] | |
7 | 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re3 Interested persons order by Bianca Velez.(MCB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/21/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re2 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bianca Velez. Related case(s): no(MCB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/21/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
5 | 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re4 Order pdf filed by Bianca Velez.(MCB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/21/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
Wednesday, December 09, 2020 | ||
4 | 4 ORDERED: Plaintiff is directed to SHOW CAUSE as to why venue of this action is proper in the Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1391(b). Plaintiff shall file a written response with the Court within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order. Additionally, Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint, which cures the deficiency as to venue, within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order. Failure to respond to this Order within the time provided will result in this action being transferred to a more appropriate venue, without further notice. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 12/9/2020. (CSS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/21/2020.] | |
Monday, December 07, 2020 | ||
3 | 3 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/21/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 12/7/2020. (BGS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/21/2020.] | |
2 | 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/21/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 12/7/2020. (BGS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/21/2020.] | |
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Bill de Blasio, Andrew Cuomo, Tony Evers, Jay Inslee, Gavin Newsom, Gretchen Whitmore, Tom Wolf filed by Bianca Velez.(Filing Fee Not Paid - No IFP Motion Filed.)(CRH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/21/2020.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Mailing Envelope, | ||
Att: 4 Mailing Envelope, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons |