Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:20-bk-30108

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Eduardo V Rodriguez
Case #: 4:20-ap-03503
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2020
Terminated:Aug 17, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Summer Energy, LLC, Defendant
5847 San Felipe Street, Suite 3700
Houston, TX 77057
Represented By
Summer Energy, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald J. Sommers, Chapter 7 Trustee, Plaintiff
Nathan Sommers Jacobs 2800 Post Oak Boulevard, 61st Floor
Houston, TX 77056
Represented By
Kell Corrigan Mercer
Kell C. Mercer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/17 2:54 PM
Adversary Case 4:20-ap-3503 Closed. (jchavez)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 16, 2021
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/17 3:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/16/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, July 14, 2021
21 21 order Default Judgment Wed 07/14 2:59 PM
Final Default Judgment Against Defendant Summer Energy, LLC. Related [+] Signed on 7/14/2021. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 15
20 20 court Courtroom Minutes Wed 07/14 2:41 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 1:30 p.m.. Appearances: Kell Mercer and Russ Horton for the Plaintiff. Minutes: Opening general statements by Mr. Mercer regarding 20-3448 20-3502 20-3503 and 20-3504 Plaintiff's Exhibits 1-3 were admitted. Arguments heard. Mr. Mercer was questioned regarding service. Default Judgment granted as stated on the record.. Related [+]. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Default Judgment
Friday, July 09, 2021
19 19 misc Exhibit List Fri 07/09 12:54 PM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By Ronald J. Sommers, Chapter 7 Trustee ) Related [+] (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Default Judgment
Saturday, June 19, 2021
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/19 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/19/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order Setting Hearing
Friday, June 18, 2021
17 17 misc Certificate Fri 06/18 5:05 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order Setting Hearing (Filed By Ronald J. Sommers, Chapter 7 Trustee ) Related [+] (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-] 16 Order Setting Hearing
Thursday, June 17, 2021
16 16 order Setting Hearing Thu 06/17 10:56 AM
Order Canceling Status Conference and Setting Electronic Hearing. Signed on 6/17/2021 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2021 at 01:30 PM via telephone and video conference. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 12 Order Setting Hearing,15 Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
15 15 motion Default Judgment Wed 06/16 1:19 PM
Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Ronald J. Sommers, Chapter 7 Trustee (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kell C. Mercer
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 27, 2021
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/27 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/27/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Setting Hearing
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
13 13 misc Certificate Wed 05/26 1:15 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order Setting Electronic Status Conference (Filed By Ronald J. Sommers, Chapter 7 Trustee ) Related [+] (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-] 12 Order Setting Hearing
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
12 12 order Setting Hearing Tue 05/25 3:37 PM
Order Setting Electronic Status Conference. Signed on 5/25/2021 Status conference to be held on 6/29/2021 at 09:30 AM via telephone and video conference. (jchavez)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 22, 2021
11 11 court Entry (Adversary) Mon 03/22 8:50 AM
Scheduling Conference4 terminated. (jchavez)
Related: [-]
10 10 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 03/22 8:45 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Summer Energy, LLC. Related [+]. (jchavez)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Motion
Sunday, March 21, 2021
9 9 motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Sun 03/21 10:35 AM
Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk Filed by Ronald J. Sommers, Chapter 7 Trustee (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Clerk's Entry of Default
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Sun 03/21 9:43 AM
Summons Service Executed on Summer Energy, LLC 12/28/2020. (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
7 7 misc Status Report Wed 03/17 12:01 PM
Status Report (Filed By Ronald J. Sommers, Chapter 7 Trustee ) Related [+] (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Order Setting Hearing
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
6 6 misc Certificate Tue 02/23 3:20 PM
Certificate of Service on Defendant Summer Energy, LLC (Filed By Ronald J. Sommers, Chapter 7 Trustee ) Related [+] (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-] 4 Order Setting Hearing
Sunday, February 21, 2021
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 02/21 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Setting Hearing
Friday, February 19, 2021
4 4 order Setting Hearing Fri 02/19 9:49 AM
Order for Electronic Scheduling Conference. Signed on 2/19/2021 Hearing scheduled for 3/22/2021 at 10:00 AM via telephone and video conference. (jchavez)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 12/28 11:30 AM
Summons Issued on Summer Energy, LLC Date Issued 12/28/2020. (hler)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 26, 2020
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Sat 12/26 11:37 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Summer Energy, LLC. (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 19, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Sat 12/19 10:11 AM
Adversary case 20-03503 Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers, for Damages, and For Other Relief by Ronald J. Sommers, Chapter 7 Trustee against Summer Energy, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Mercer, Kell)
Related: [-]