Easley v. Saul
Mississippi Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Roy Percy |
Referred: | Roy Percy |
Case #: | 4:20-cv-00218 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision |
Case Filed: | Dec 29, 2020 |
Terminated: | Sep 23, 2021 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, July 19, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
USCA Judgment
Tue 07/19 9:15 AM
USCA JUDGMENT as to22 Notice of Appeal, filed by Roger Easley; affirming judgment of District Court (jla) |
|
Monday, December 27, 2021 | ||
appeal
Notice of Certification of Record on Appeal
Mon 12/27 8:19 AM
Notice of Certification of Electronic Record on Appeal. The Court of Appeals has accepted the Electronic Record on Appeal and it is available for attorney access and download using instructions found at ([LINK:THIS LINK.] ) Use the login credentials provided to you by the Court of Appeals clerk. (jtm) |
||
Sunday, December 19, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
appeal
Appeal Transcript
Sun 12/19 8:05 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Social Security Hearing for dates of 09/22/2021, before Judge Roy Percy, re22 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter/Transcriber Rita Davis, Telephone number 662-281-3027. Tape Number: rita_davis@msnd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The Policy is located on our website at www.msnd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2022. (rd) |
|
Tuesday, November 30, 2021 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 11/30 10:00 AM
USCA Case Number 21-60888 for22 Notice of Appeal, filed by Roger Easley. (jla) |
||
Thursday, November 18, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Transcript Request
Thu 11/18 3:29 PM
AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 09/22/21 before Judge Percy.. Modified on 11/18/2021 (jtm) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Transcript Request
Thu 11/18 2:55 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 09/21/21 before Judge Judge Percy.. |
|
22 | 22
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 11/18 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Leanna Reynolds on behalf of Roger Easley. Transcript Order Form to appellant available electronically ([LINK:Transcript Order Form] ) or by U.S. Mail as appropriate. |
|
notice
Notice of Correction
Thu 11/18 3:38 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re23 Transcript Request; Attorney to refile request with correct hearing date. (jla) |
||
Thursday, September 23, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
order
Judgment
Thu 09/23 10:31 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Kilolo Kijakazi against Roger Easley. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/23/2021. (yf) |
|
Wednesday, September 22, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
minutes
Social Security Hearing
Wed 09/22 10:55 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Social Security Hearing held on 9/22/2021 *Audio Recorded during Proceeding. (Court Reporter digital.) (rtc) |
|
Tuesday, September 21, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 09/21 12:35 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER re Social Security Hearing: Hearing to be conducted telephonically. Counsel should get on a line together before calling into our courtroom teleconference line at 662-281-3098 at the time set for the hearing. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/21/2021. (No document attached) (rtc) |
|
Thursday, September 16, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 09/16 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Luke Benedict on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Benedict, Joseph) |
|
Monday, August 30, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Memorandum in Support
Mon 08/30 10:43 AM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re12 Brief Reply Brief filed by Roger Easley. |
|
Friday, August 13, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Brief
Fri 08/13 1:27 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE COMMISSIONER'S DECISION . (Gough, John) |
|
Thursday, July 22, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/22 4:38 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jla) |
|
Tuesday, July 20, 2021 | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/20 1:17 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Brief due by 8/13/2021. (jla) |
||
Monday, July 19, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 07/19 11:03 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's brief due August 13, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/19/2021. (yf) |
|
Wednesday, July 14, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 07/14 2:54 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time [to File Commissioner's Brief {Unopposed}] by Andrew Saul. (Gough, John) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Brief
Tue 06/15 11:09 AM
BRIEF . |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Spears v. Commissioner, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Gill v Commissioner, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Christian v. Commissioner | ||
Friday, May 21, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 05/21 3:10 PM
ORDER Concerning Consent to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/21/2021. (rtc) |
|
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 05/21 3:07 PM
ORDER Directing Filing of Briefs and Scheduling Oral Argument. Social Security Hearing set for 9/22/2021 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/21/2021. (rtc) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Social Security Transcript
Fri 05/21 1:56 PM
Social Security Transcript by Andrew Saul. (Gough, John) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/21 1:55 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Andrew Saul. (Gough, John) |
|
Friday, April 02, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 04/02 9:53 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Andrew Saul answer due 6/1/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/2/2021. (yf) |
|
Wednesday, March 31, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 03/31 2:05 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer [Unopposed] by Andrew Saul. (Gough, John) |
|
Att: 1 3/17/2021 Declaration | ||
Tuesday, March 02, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 03/02 1:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrew Saul served on 2/1/2021. (tab) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 01/12 4:36 PM
Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; forwarded to US Marshal for service (jla) |
|
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 01/05 4:34 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/5/2021. (yf) |
|
Tuesday, December 29, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 12/29 2:37 PM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roger Easley. (jtm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/29 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT, filed by Roger Easley. (jtm) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Assignment
Tue 12/29 2:37 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M. Brown and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm) |