Easley v. Kijakazi
Original Case: 4:20-cv-00218
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-ss-60888 |
Type | social security / united states |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Case Filed: | Nov 19, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 27, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday May 30, 2022 3:26 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Roger Easley
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 27 2022
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-60888 Affirmed] Judge: PEH, Judge: SAH, Judge: SKD Mandate issue date is 07/19/2022 [21-60888] |
Docket last updated: 05/30/2022 3:26 AM CDT |
Friday, November 19, 2021 | ||
SOCIAL SECURITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Roger Easley 21-60888 (CB) |