Rhode Island District Court
Judge:John J Mcconnell, Jr
Referred: Patricia A Sullivan
Case #: 1:21-cv-00003
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2021
Terminated:Apr 19, 2023
Case in other court:Providence County Superior Court, PC2020-07233
Last checked: Saturday Jul 03, 2021 5:42 AM EDT
Defendant
HB Employee Services, LLC
Represented By
Breegan C. Semonelli
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Jillian S. Folger-Hartwell
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carline Vilbon
Represented By
Richard J. Savage
Savage & Savage
contact info

GPO Apr 19 2023
ORDER granting 17 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award, denying 20 MOTION to Amend Complaint to Join Cumberland Police Department, denying 21 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award, and denying 29 MOTION for relief from judgment pursuant to Rule 60 (b)(1)(3). So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/19/2023. (Jackson, Ryan)

Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
38 38 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 04/23 11:33 AM
MANDATE of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit issued as to and in accordance with33 Notice of Appeal, filed by Carline Vilbon (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
37 37 appeal USCA Judgment Tue 04/01 8:41 AM
JUDGMENT of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit entered as to33 Notice of Appeal, filed by Carline Vilbon. JUDGMENT entered by David J. Barron, Chief Appellate Judge; Gustavo A. Gelp, Jr., Appellate Judge and Lara E. Montecalvo, Appellate Judge. 23-1386 Affirmed. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/17 12:18 PM
TEXT ORDER denying36 MOTION to Expunge Case Information and Court Records : DENIED. There is no basis in law or fact for the Court to seal this case. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/17/2024. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
36 36 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/12 3:00 PM
MOTION to Expunge Case Information and Court Records filed by Carline Vilbon. Responses due by 1/26/2024.(Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Friday, April 28, 2023
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Fri 04/28 8:48 AM
TEXT ORDER granting34 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/28/2023. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
appeal USCA Case Number Wed 04/26 9:19 AM
USCA Case Number 23-1386 for33 Notice of Appeal filed by Carline Vilbon. (DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
35 35 appeal Clerk's Certificate and Appellate Cover Sheet Re: Appeal Record Tue 04/25 3:10 PM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE AND APPELLATE COVER SHEET: Abbreviated record on appeal consisting of notice of appeal, order(s) being appealed, and a certified copy of the district court docket report transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 11.0(b).33 Notice of Appeal.(DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Record on Appeal
34 34 motion Appeal In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/25 3:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Carline Vilbon.(DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Email
33 33 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 04/25 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Carline Vilbon as to32 Judgment NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf Appeal Record due by 5/2/2023.(DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Email
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
32 32 order Judgment Wed 04/19 2:12 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of HB Employee Services, LLC against Carline Vilbon. So Ordered by Deputy Clerk: Ryan H. Jackson on 4/19/2023. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
31 31 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Vacate Wed 04/19 2:07 PM
ORDER granting17 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award, denying20 MOTION to Amend Complaint to Join Cumberland Police Department, denying21 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award, and denying29 MOTION for relief from judgment pursuant to Rule 60 (b)(1)(3). So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/19/2023. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
30 30 respm Response to Motion Tue 03/28 3:36 PM
RESPONSE In Opposition to29 MOTION for relief from judgment pursuant to Rule 60 (b)(1) (3) of the Fed. R. Civ. Pro. re: Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, filed by HB Employee Services, LLC. Replies due by 4/4/2023. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
29 29 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/21 3:50 PM
MOTION for relief from judgment pursuant to Rule 60 (b)(1) (3) of the Fed. R. Civ. Pro. re: 02/10/2023 TEXT ORDER on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by Carline Vilbon. Responses due by 4/4/2023.(Kenny, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
28 28 respm Reply to Response Tue 03/21 10:01 AM
REPLY to Response re27 Response to Motion, filed by Carline Vilbon.(DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Email
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 03/14 10:37 AM
TEXT ORDER granting24 MOTION for an Extension of Time for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Join Cumberland Police Department and Motion to Vacate the Arbitration Award up to and including 3/17/23 . So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/14/2023. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
27 27 respm Response to Motion Mon 03/13 7:57 PM
RESPONSE In Opposition to20 MOTION To Amend Complaint To Join The Cumberland Police Department and Motion To Vacate Arbitration Award filed by HB Employee Services, LLC. Replies due by 3/20/2023.(Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 8.10.2021 Email Exchange,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - JAMS Comprehensive Communication Rules
26 26 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents Electronically Mon 03/13 6:41 PM
Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents Electronically filed by Carline Vilbon. (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Response to Motion Mon 03/13 6:40 PM
RESPONSE In Opposition to24 MOTION for an Extension of Time Defendant HB Employee Services, LLC's Request For an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Join Cumberland Police Department and Motion to Vacate the Arbitration Award filed by Carline Vilbon. Replies due by 3/20/2023. (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Extension of Time Mon 03/13 3:50 PM
MOTION for an Extension of Time Defendant HB Employee Services, LLC's Request For an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Join Cumberland Police Department and Motion to Vacate the Arbitration Award filed by HB Employee Services, LLC. Responses due by 3/27/2023. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
23 23 respm Response to Motion Wed 03/08 11:25 AM
RESPONSE In Opposition to22 MOTION for an Extension of Time REQUEST FOR AN EXENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed by Carline Vilbon. Replies due by 3/14/2023.(DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Email
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 03/01 3:46 PM
TEXT ORDER granting22 MOTION for an Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S20 MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT up to and including 3/13/23. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/1/2023. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
22 22 motion Extension of Time Tue 02/28 12:47 PM
MOTION for an Extension of Time REQUEST FOR AN EXENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed by HB Employee Services, LLC. Responses due by 3/14/2023. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
21 21 motion Vacate Mon 02/27 5:04 PM
RESPONSE TO17 MOTION DEFENDANT HB EMPLOYEE SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD and MOTION TO vacate Arbitration Award. filed by Carline Vilbon. Responses due by 3/13/2023.(Kenny, Meghan) Modified on 2/27/2023 to edit text (Kenny, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Envelope
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
20 20 respm Reply to Response Wed 02/15 4:49 PM
REPLY to Response re19 Response to Motion, filed by Carline Vilbon.(Kenny, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, February 10, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/10 10:39 AM
TEXT ORDER granting18 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response to17 MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD: Ms. Vilbon's Motion for an Extension18 is GRANTED to allow her more time to file an objection to the Motion to Confirm the Arbitration. Her request for an extension of time to file a Motion to Vacate is denied at this timer without prejudice. Responses due by 2/24/2023 . So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/10/2023. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
19 19 respm Response to Motion Thu 02/09 4:23 PM
RESPONSE In Opposition to18 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 MOTION DEFENDANT HB EMPLOYEE SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD filed by HB Employee Services, LLC. Replies due by 2/16/2023.(Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A & B
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/09 2:13 PM
MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 MOTION DEFENDANT HB EMPLOYEE SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD filed by Carline Vilbon. Responses due by 2/23/2023.(DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Email
Friday, January 27, 2023
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/27 9:56 AM
MOTION DEFENDANT HB EMPLOYEE SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD filed by HB Employee Services, LLC. Responses due by 2/10/2023.(Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jillian S. Folger-Hartwell
Thursday, December 15, 2022
16 16 order Scheduling Order (form attached) Thu 12/15 1:47 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2023; Joinder of Parties due by 2/15/2023; Factual Discovery to be completed by 6/15/2023; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 7/15/2023; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 8/15/2023; All Expert Discovery to be completed by 9/15/2023; Dispositive Motions to be filed by 10/15/2023. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/15/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
misc Public Docket Note Thu 12/15 1:45 PM
DOCKET NOTE: Case no longer referred for mediation (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
15 15 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to ADR Mediation Mon 11/21 12:52 PM
ORDER entered referring case to Mediation pursuant to this Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution Plan. Information about the Plan can be found by clicking[LINK:here] . So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/21/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/17 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carline Vilbon. (DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2022
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/21 10:53 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Carline Vilbon re10 Response to Order to Show Cause (DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw Fri 10/21 11:23 AM
TEXT ORDER granting12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Plaintiff is hereby ordered to have new counsel enter an appearance or enter pro se on or before 11/20/22 or this matter will be dismissed. Counsel is further hereby directed to serve a copy of this Text Order on the plaintiff by mail and/or by hand. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/21/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
12 12 motion Withdraw Tue 10/18 2:13 PM
First MOTION to Withdraw filed by Carline Vilbon. Responses due by 11/1/2022. (Savage, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
order Order Thu 10/13 10:35 AM
TEXT SHOW CAUSE ORDER: If plaintiff's counsel wishes to withdraw from this matter, then he is hereby directed to file a Motion to Withdraw within 5 days of the entry of this order (or by 10/18/22). So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/13/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/05 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Julia R. Shackleton on behalf of HB Employee Services, LLC (Shackleton, Julia)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 10/05 10:19 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Carline Vilbon. (DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
order Order to Show Cause (Form Attached) Tue 10/04 2:54 PM
TEXT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered: The Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause, in writing, why this matter should not be dismsised in light of the reported arbitration award, and for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 10/28/2022. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/4/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
9 9 misc Status Report Mon 10/03 4:44 PM
STATUS REPORT by HB Employee Services, LLC. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
order Order Thu 05/13 9:56 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties shall submit a status report on or before November 15, 2021- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/13/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
8 8 misc Status Report Wed 05/12 4:12 PM
STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Savage, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/22 3:43 PM
NOTICE by HB Employee Services, LLC OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF BREEGAN SEMONELLI (Semonelli, Breegan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 01/12 10:47 AM
TEXT ORDER granting6 Motion to Dismiss and stay claims in favor of arbitration. The Parties shall file a written status report on or before 5/12/21 - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/12/2021. (Barletta, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 11, 2021
6 6 motion Dismiss Mon 01/11 4:09 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims In Favor of Binding Arbitration and Stay Case filed by HB Employee Services, LLC. Responses due by 1/25/2021. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
5 5 misc State Court Record Tue 01/05 9:54 AM
STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Hicks, Alyson)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 04, 2021
4 4 1 pgs order Order of Recusal (Form Attached) Mon 01/04 6:19 PM
TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL entered. District Judge William E. Smith recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/4/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/04 5:19 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by HB Employee Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., Corporate Parent Black Rock, Inc. for HB Employee Services, LLC.. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Case Opening Notice (Form Attached) Mon 01/04 5:06 PM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs notice Notice of Removal - New Case Mon 01/04 4:48 PM
NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2020-07233. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0103-1581186, filed by HB Employee Services, LLC.(Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/04 5:06 PM
Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hicks, Alyson)
Related: [-]