Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam A Lindsay
Referred: David L Horan
Case #: 3:21-cv-00037
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2021
Re-opened:Sep 06, 2022
Terminated:May 06, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 06, 2021 3:48 AM CDT
Defendant
Dallas County
Plaintiff
Kyle Damond Jones
219 W Cherry Point
Dallas, TX 75232

GPO Jan 12 2021
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: 3 Complaint. The Court should dismiss the claims as currently pled. But,because Jones is proceeding pro se, the Court should offer him one opportunity to amend, to the extent that he believes he can allege a plausible constitutional violation against Dallas County as a municipality. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/12/2021) (hml)
GPO Apr 02 2021
Order Accepting Findings and Recommendations re: 7 Findings and Recommendations on Case re: 3 Complaint filed by Kyle Damond Jones. The court, therefore, overrules Plaintiff's objections and dismisses without prejudice his Complaint, but it will allow him to amend his pleadings to correct the deficiencies noted by the magistrate judge. Any amended complaint must be filed by Plaintiff by April 30, 2021. Failure to file an amended complaint by this date will result in dismissal without prejudice of this action under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute and comply with a court order. As the court is allowing Plaintiff to amend his pleadings in accordance with the magistrate judges recommendation, it denies as moot his 9 Motion to Amend Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 4/2/2021) (chmb)
GPO May 04 2021
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE on Case. The Court should dismiss this case with prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 5/4/2021) (ykp)
GPO May 31 2021
Order Accepting Findings and Recommendations and Denying Certificate of Appealability. The court certifies that any appeal of this action would not be taken in good faith. re: 14 Findings and Recommendations on Case re: 3 Complaint filed by Kyle Damond Jones. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 5/31/2021) (svc)
GPO Sep 16 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ON POST-REMAND SCREENING, GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND, SPECIFYING FURTHER ACTION BY THE CLERK, AND REQUIRING SERVICE BY THE MARSHAL: The Court will therefore GRANT the motions to amend [Dkt. Nos. 26, 28] and SERVE this action on the County. And, because the Court previously granted Jones leave to proceed in forma pauperis under the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915, see Dkt. Nos. 6,7, the Court now ORDERS, under Section 1915(d) and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(c)(3) and 4(j)(2), that the Clerk of the Court issue summons and that the United States Marshal serve process (to include Dkt. Nos. 3, 22, 25-28. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/16/2022) (oyh)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 06, 2024
53 53 order Judgment Mon 05/06 1:18 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Dallas County against Kyle Damond Jones. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 5/6/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
52 52 10 pgs order Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations Mon 05/06 1:14 PM
Order Accepting51 Findings and Recommendations and granting43 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Dallas County. The court certifies that any appeal of this action would not be taken in good faith. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 5/6/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]