Original Case: 3:21-cv-00037

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cr-10617
Typecivil rights / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2021
Terminated:Aug 12, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 16, 2022 3:29 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Dallas County
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kyle Damond Jones
Represented By
Kyle Damond Jones
contact info

GPO Aug 12 2022
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-10617 Reversed ] Judge: CES, Judge: JWE, Judge: JEG. Mandate issue date is 09/06/2022 [21-10617]

Docket last updated: 08/16/2022 3:29 AM CDT
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
1 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Kyle Damond Jones 21-10617 (LEF)
Related: [-]