Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-30229

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Dennis Montali
Case #: 3:21-ap-03003
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2021
Terminated:Oct 22, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Express Travel Related Service Company
200 Vesey St.
New York, NY 10285
Represented By
American Express Travel Related Service Company
contact info
Defendant
American Express Company
200 Vesey Street
New York, NY 10285
Represented By
American Express Company
contact info
Defendant
American Express Bank, F.S.B.
4315 South 2700 West
Salt Lake City, UT 84184
Represented By
American Express Bank, F.S.B.
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda S. Green, Trustee in Bankruptcy of the Estate of Richard M. Glantz, Inc.
P.O. Box 2949
San Anselmo, CA 94979
Represented By
John H. MacConaghy
Macconaghy And Barnier
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Friday, October 22, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/22 9:35 AM
Adversary Case Closed 3:21-ap-3003. (pw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
12 12 stip Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 10/21 5:11 PM
Stipulation to Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green Related [+]. Case Management Action due after 11/4/2021. (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Wed 03/24 3:23 PM
Hearing Continued. The Scheduling Conference on 3/26 is continued to 10/29/21 at 1:30 pm per the court's 3/24/21 Docket Text Order. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 at 01:30 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Linda S. Green
order Judge Docket Order Wed 03/24 3:05 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) The court has read the plaintiff's status report and CONTINUES the March 26, 2021, 1:30 PM Scheduling Conference to October 29, 2021, at 1:30 PM. Court fixes a fact discovery cut off of July 15, 2021, a deadline of August 15, 2021 for expert disclosures pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(2)(A), and an expert discovery cut off date of October 15, 2021. (Montali, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/23 2:25 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Defendants American Express Bank, F.S.B., American Express Company, American Express Travel Related Service Company (Sweeney, Kelly)
Related: [-] 9 Answer to Complaint,10 Statement
10 10 misc Statement Tue 03/23 2:23 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosures Related [+]. Filed by Defendants American Express Bank, F.S.B., American Express Company, American Express Travel Related Service Company (Sweeney, Kelly) DEFECTIVE ENTRY: Incorrect event code selected. Modified on 3/23/2021 (myt)
Related: [-] 9 Answer to Complaint
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/23 2:20 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by American Express Bank, F.S.B., American Express Company, American Express Travel Related Service Company. (Sweeney, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
8 8 misc Status Conference Statement Fri 03/19 6:10 PM
Status Conference Statement . Filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 02/11 2:31 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Defendants American Express Bank, F.S.B., American Express Company, American Express Travel Related Service Company (Sweeney, Kelly)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation Referring to Existing Document(s)
6 6 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Thu 02/11 2:30 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint Filed by Defendants American Express Bank, F.S.B., American Express Company, American Express Travel Related Service Company Related [+]. (Sweeney, Kelly)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green,5 Summons Service Executed
Monday, January 18, 2021
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 01/18 10:01 AM
Summons Service Executed on American Express Bank, F.S.B. 1/17/2021; American Express Company 1/17/2021; American Express Travel Related Service Company 1/17/2021 . (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 01/13 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 01/13/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Discovery Order
Monday, January 11, 2021
3 3 order Discovery Mon 01/11 3:18 PM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (lb)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 01/11 3:17 PM
Summons Issued on American Express Bank, F.S.B. Answer Due 2/10/2021; American Express Company Answer Due 2/10/2021; American Express Travel Related Service Company Answer Due 2/10/2021 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 3/26/2021 at 01:30 PM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (lb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Linda S. Green
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/11 1:24 PM
Adversary case[LINK 21-03003 . 13 Related [+], 14 Complaint by Linda S. Green against American Express Travel Related Service Company, American Express Company, American Express Bank, F.S.B.. Fee Amount $350. (MacConaghy, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet