Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Rolando Olvera
Referred: Ignacio Torteya, III
Case #: 1:20-cv-00209
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2020
Terminated:Aug 30, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jun 13, 2021 5:15 AM CDT
Defendant
City of South Padre Island
City Government 4601 Padre Blvd.
SPI, TX 78597
Represented By
Robert Lee Drinkard
Denton Navarro Rocha Bernal PC
contact info
Ricardo J. Navarro
Denton Navarro Rocha Bernal & Zech, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
John Doe
Detective - SPI PD 4601 Padre Island
SPI, TX 78597
Defendant
David C Laird
Police Officer - SPI PD 4601 Padre Blvd
S. Padre Island, TX 78597
Represented By
Robert Lee Drinkard
Denton Navarro Rocha Bernal PC
contact info
Ricardo J. Navarro
Denton Navarro Rocha Bernal & Zech, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Claudine O'Carroll
Chief of Police - SPI PD 4601 Padre Blvd
SPI, TX 78597
Represented By
Robert Lee Drinkard
Denton Navarro Rocha Bernal PC
contact info
Ricardo J. Navarro
Denton Navarro Rocha Bernal & Zech, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Beri Dave
3213 Lazy Palm Drive N
Harlingen, TX 78552

GPO Nov 30 2021
e by 12/14/2021(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(EdnitaPonce, 1)REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 55 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM pursuant to Rule 8, 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1); and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's "Motion for More Definite Statement". Objections to R&R du
GPO Mar 08 2022
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 62 Report and Recommendations, 55 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM pursuant to Rule 8, 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1); and Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's "Motion for More Definite Statement". Plaintiff's claims against David C. Laird, Claudine O'Carroll, and City of South Padre Island are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
GPO Mar 25 2022
AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 62 Report and Recommendations. Defendants' MTD (Dkt. No 55) is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiff's claims against David C. Laird, and all claims against Defendants which stem from the conduct of David C. Laird are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(dnoriega, 1)
GPO Jul 28 2022
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint, 82 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6) MOTION for Summary Judgment Objections to R&R due by 8/11/2022(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1)
GPO Aug 30 2022
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 82 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12 (b)(6) MOTION for Summary Judgment, 105 Report and Recommendations. Finding no clear error, the R&R is ADOPTED. Defendants' MTD 82 is GRANTED. All claims against Defendants' Jaime Rodriguez, City of South Padre Island, and Claudine O'Carroll are DISMISSED. The Clerk of Court is ORDERED to close this case. (Signed by Judge Rolando Olvera) Parties notified.(scastillo, 1)

Docket last updated: 12/10/2022 9:07 AM CST
Tuesday, December 15, 2020
1 1 Civil Rights COMPLAINT against David C Laird, Police Officer, Detective John Doe, Claudine O'Carroll, Chief of Police, and City of South Padre Island, filed by Beri Dave. (rnieto, 1) Modified on 1/5/2021 (dbenavides, 1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Citizen's complaint form,
Att: 2 Facts of Incident with photos,
Att: 3 civil cover sheet
2 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Beri Dave, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/5/2021. Motions referred to Ignacio Torteya, III. (rnieto, 1)
Related: [-]