Original Case: 1:20-cv-00209

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cr-40653
Typecivil rights / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 30, 2022
Terminated:Apr 18, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 19, 2023 3:29 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Claudine O'Carroll, Chief of Police - SPI Police Department
Represented By
Robert Lee Drinkard
Denton, Navarro, Rocha, Bernal & Zech, P.C.
contact info
Ricardo Jimenez Navarro
Denton, Navarro, Rocha, Bernal & Zech, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
City of South Padre Island, City Government
Represented By
Robert Lee Drinkard
Denton, Navarro, Rocha, Bernal & Zech, P.C.
contact info
Ricardo Jimenez Navarro
Denton, Navarro, Rocha, Bernal & Zech, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Jaime Rodriguez
Represented By
Robert Lee Drinkard
Denton, Navarro, Rocha, Bernal & Zech, P.C.
contact info
Ricardo Jimenez Navarro
Denton, Navarro, Rocha, Bernal & Zech, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Beri Dave
Represented By
Beri Dave
contact info

GPO Apr 18 2023
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [22-40653 Affirmed ] Judge: EBC , Judge: JEG , Judge: CTW Mandate issue date is 05/10/2023 [22-40653]

Docket last updated: 04/19/2023 3:29 AM CDT
Friday, September 30, 2022
5 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Beri Dave 22-40653 (CAG)
Related: [-]